St. George Pharmacy Inc. et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Plaintiff: St. George Pharmacy Inc. and Amal Properties LLC
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv03763
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration and NOTICE Scheduling Arbitration Hearing. Procedures and Instructions for the selection of arbitrator sent to counsel.The Arbitration hearing is scheduled for March 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The deadline to select the Arbitrator is January 11, 2021. Counsel will select the Arbitrator from the Courts Panel of Arbitrators found at:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Arbitration/displayAllArb.cfm?geo=&specialtyMult=21In preparation for the arbitration hearing counsel will review the EDNY REMOTE GUIDELINES FOR ARBITRATION PARTICIPANTS included with this notice. Counsel will submit the fully executed Stipulation for Selection of Arbitrator by email to the Arbitration Coordinator: Rita Credle at: rita_credle@nyed.uscourts.gov. (Credle, Rita) (Credle, Rita)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: September 14, 2020. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: October 2, 2020. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: December 31, 2020. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): February 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: March 30, 2021. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by: April 30, 2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: May 28, 2021. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: May 28, 2021. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): June 14, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: June 28, 2021. Joint pretrial order due by: July 26, 2021. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2020. (Orenstein, James)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: Initial Conference Hearing held by telephone on 9/14/2020. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on February 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on June 21, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: The plaintiff has no procedural objection to the removal of the case to this court. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Disclosure Questionnaire (Rabinovich, Roman)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on September 14, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than September 10, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/31/2020. (Almonte, Kelly)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmGUARD Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company for AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Glazer, Yale)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmGUARD Insurance Company from New York State Supreme Court, County of Richmond, case number 150786/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13228781) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action) (Glazer, Yale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. George Pharmacy Inc. et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Represented By: Yale Howard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. George Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Roman Rabinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amal Properties LLC
Represented By: Roman Rabinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?