Pesantes v. Gomberg
Plaintiff: Loren Pesantes
Defendant: Alex Gomberg
Case Number: 1:2020cv03766
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #16 is granted. Defendant shall file their answer on or before 10/26/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/28/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial/telephone conference will be held at 10:00 AM on 11/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 10:00 AM conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 11/19/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/28/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Alex Gomberg. (Schmidt, Frederick)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/24/2020. (Helwig, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Daniel Schmidt, Jr on behalf of Alex Gomberg (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Schmidt, Frederick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to Substitute Attorney: NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Frederick Daniel Schmidt, Jr (Schmidt, Frederick) Modified on 9/23/2020 (Manson, Eddie).
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 The case of Pesantes v. Gomberg, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv3766. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-02448. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the undersigned parties that the within action shall be and is hereby transferred to the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is instructed to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/18/2020) (va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Loren Pesantes..(Camacho, Edwin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter filed by Loren Pesantes. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to submit a joint proposed stipulation and order seeking transfer to the Eastern District of New York forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/4/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Edwin Camacho, Esq. dated 08/03/2020 re: Transfer matter to another District. Document filed by Loren Pesantes..(Camacho, Edwin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Varga on behalf of Alex Gomberg..(Varga, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alex Gomberg served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. Service was accepted by Alex Gomberg, Defendant. Document filed by Loren Pesantes..(Camacho, Edwin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edwin Camacho on behalf of Loren Pesantes..(Camacho, Edwin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Gomberg..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sabrina Assayag Vict. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Queens; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Victor, Sabrina) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALEX GOMBERG, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Loren Pesantes..(Victor, Sabrina) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Gomberg. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19178563)Document filed by Loren Pesantes..(Victor, Sabrina) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pesantes v. Gomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Pesantes
Represented By: Sabrina Assayag Victor
Represented By: Edwin Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Gomberg
Represented By: Robert Varga
Represented By: Frederick Daniel Schmidt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?