Ogungbemi v. Saul
Plaintiff: Adepeju Mujidat Ogungbemi
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03769
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adepeju Mujidat Ogungbemi. Andrew Saul served on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (DeHaan, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Tankard, Frank)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall promptly obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by November 19, 2020. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a motion for judgment on the pleadings by January 19, 2021. Defendant shall serve Plaintiff with its response to Plaintiff's motion, which must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by March 19, 2021. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a reply, if any, and file the fully briefed motion by April 9, 2020. As a courtesy, unless objected to by the parties, the Court asks that the parties file the motion only once it is fully briefed. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with a courtesy copy of the filed, stamped, fully briefed motion, within two business days of filing. Memoranda of law and courtesy copies shall comply with this Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 8/19/2020. (Williams, Erica)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13229607 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Adepeju Mujidat Ogungbemi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (DeHaan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogungbemi v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Frank D. Tankard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adepeju Mujidat Ogungbemi
Represented By: John W. DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?