Kuznetsova v. Medina
Plaintiff: Nina Kuznetsova
Defendant: Michael Medina
Case Number: 1:2020cv03775
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 20, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate. Counsel with knowledge and authority for all represented parties must attend. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. For any party not represented by counsel, that party must attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerks Office. The parties are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions, and should discuss the attached Proposed Discovery Plan, in advance of the conference. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing, must notify the opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent to the request. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/20/2020. (Copy of this Order and Judge Kuo's Individual Practice Rules is mailed to pro se plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan) (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nina Kuznetsova. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Medina, filed by Nina Kuznetsova. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuznetsova v. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Kuznetsova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?