Alagappan v. Baidu, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ganesan Alagappan
Defendant: Robin Yanhong Li, Herman Cheng-Chun Yu, Baidu, Inc. and Jennifer Xinzhe Li
Case Number: 1:2020cv03794
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Baidu, Inc., answer due 10/20/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/9/2020. (LK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Baidu, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Griffin, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Baidu, Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baidu, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Baidu, Inc.. (Fumerton, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Fumerton on behalf of Baidu, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fumerton, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Baidu, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Musoff, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baidu, Inc., Jennifer Xinzhe Li, Robin Yanhong Li, Herman Cheng-Chun Yu. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baidu, Inc., Jennifer Xinzhe Li, Robin Yanhong Li, Herman Cheng-Chun Yu filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13235308 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Ganesan Alagappan. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Order) (Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alagappan v. Baidu, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ganesan Alagappan
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Yanhong Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Cheng-Chun Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baidu, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Robert Alexander Fumerton
Represented By: Michael Charles Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Xinzhe Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?