Barrios v. ABC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cesar Barrios
Defendant: ABC Corporation doing business as Mario'S Pizza Chicken & Grill and Ahmadi Mohiddin
Case Number: 1:2020cv03798
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #13 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 10/28/2020 at 12:45 PM and will be held by telephone. Parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. They are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #9 and shall file on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/29/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 1, 2020 by Cesar Barrios. (Avshalumov, Roman)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Barrios. ABC Corporation served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Avshalumov, Roman)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Cesar Barrios (aty to be noticed) (O'Donnell, James)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 8/21/2020. (Marziliano, August)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 10/1/2020 at 11:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/20/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Cesar Barrios (Avshalumov, Roman)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 19, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Cesar Barrios. (Avshalumov, Roman)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Cesar Barrios (Avshalumov, Roman)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Cesar Barrios (Avshalumov, Roman)
August 19, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Corporation, AHMADI MOHIDDIN filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13236435 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Cesar Barrios. (Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrios v. ABC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Barrios
Represented By: Roman M. Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation doing business as Mario'S Pizza Chicken & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmadi Mohiddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?