Nunez v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Swale Nunez
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03911
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/13/2020. Appearances: David Zeitzoff, Esq. and Abram I. Bohrer, Esq. for Plaintiff; Scott Eisenberg, Esq. for Defendant. Discussions held. The parties' #11 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT is approved. All discovery due by 4/13/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Status Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Telephone Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. The parties are directed to participate in the scheduled telephone conference by using the AT&T toll-Free Number 1-888-684-8852 and Access Code 5496961#. (Microsoft Teams Log #9:31:00-9:42:00.) (Meyer, Elise)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Eisenberg, Scott)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Video Initial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The attorneys are directed to appear via video and all other participates may join by phone using the Toll number: 1 917-933-2166 and Conference ID: 342 377 004#. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 10/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/1/2020. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Shearer on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shearer, Douglas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Eisenberg, Scott)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Eisenberg, Scott)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott P. Eisenberg on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Eisenberg, Scott)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Swale Nunez (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Swale Nunez against Delta Air Lines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13258566 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Swale Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bohrer, Abram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swale Nunez
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott P. Eisenberg
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?