Mason v. Carranza et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mason
Defendant: Richard Carranza and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv04010
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Mason. New York City Department of Education served on 10/18/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Albert, Peter)
October 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Mason. (Albert, Peter)
October 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn Mason. Richard Carranza served on 10/18/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Albert, Peter)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 NYC Ed summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 13, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Carolyn Mason (Albert, Peter)
September 13, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Carolyn Mason (Albert, Peter)
September 13, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Carolyn Mason (Albert, Peter)
September 8, 2020 SECOND NOTICE: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 28, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Carranza, New York City Department of Education filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13278984 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Carolyn Mason(as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.D.), Carolyn Mason(Individually). (Albert, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Carranza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mason
Represented By: Peter G. Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?