Ryeco, LLC v. Legend Produce Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ryeco, LLC
Defendant: Solomon Muratov, Legend Produce Inc., Shlomo Muratov and Natalie H. Efraimov
Case Number: 1:2020cv04044
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Natalie H. Efraimov, Legend Produce Inc., Solomon Muratov has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Natalie H. Efraimov, Legend Produce Inc., Solomon Muratov is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda J.) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/23/2020) (Poveda, Jalitza).
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by Ryeco, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order / Certificate of Default) (Brown, Gregory)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint. Natalie H. Efraimov served on On 9/22/2020. Service was accepted by "John Doe" as Father of the defendant in Brooklyn, New York., filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint. Solomon Muratov a/k/a Shlomo Muratov served on 09/04/2020. Service was accepted by Sam "Doe" who refused to give last name, as brother-in-law of the Defendant in Brooklyn, New York, filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Brown, Gregory)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint. Legend Produce Inc. served on 09/08/20. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist in the office of the New York State Secretary of State. Service was made by additional mailing, filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice Pursuant to NY Business Corporation Law 306) (Brown, Gregory)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Natalie H. Efraimov, Legend Produce Inc., Solomon Muratov. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Natalie H. Efraimov, Legend Produce Inc., Solomon Muratov filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13289108 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Legend Produce Inc., #3 Proposed Summons for Natalie H. Efraimov, #4 Proposed Summons for Solomon Muratov) (Brown, Gregory)
August 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryeco, LLC v. Legend Produce Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Muratov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Produce Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shlomo Muratov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie H. Efraimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryeco, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?