Nachmenson v. de Blasio et al
Plaintiff: Geula Nachmenson
Defendant: Jenny Gomez, The Mayor de Blasio, Department of Homeless Services and Department of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv04087
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #6 Notice of Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Clerk's Judgment, by Geula Nachmenson. No fee paid. In Forma Pauperis denied for purposes of appeal. Although timely, Appellant requests and additional 90 days for his appeal. This will be addressed at Circuit. (McGee, Mary Ann)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal, See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 9/15/2020. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff Geula Nachmenson ("Plaintiff") filed the instant pro se action against the Mayor of the City of New York, a New York City employee, and two New York City agencies. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint is hereby dismissed. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff fails to state a claim under civil rights laws or the Fair Housing Act and provides no other basis for this Court's subject matter jurisdiction over her pending eviction. Accordingly, the Complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to plaintiff and note service on the docket, enter judgment in favor of defendants, dismiss this action, and close this case. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/11/2020. (Love, Alexis)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Geula Nachmenson. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Geula Nachmenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nachmenson v. de Blasio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mayor de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeless Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geula Nachmenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?