Bedasie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Vijay Bedasie
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv04094
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file the administrative record which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before December 28, 2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by January 25, 2021. Defendant shall file and serve a response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by February 23, 2021; and Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply, if any, by March 20, 2021. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/20/2020.
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by filing the certified administrative record in lieu of the answer by Commissioner of Social Security. (Canning, Dennis)
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Canning on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Canning, Dennis)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 9/2/2020 Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is granted #2 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon Defendant without prepayment of fees. Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint on or before October 28, 2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by November 25, 2020. Defendant shall file and serve a response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by December 23, 2020; and Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply, if any, by January 20, 2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 9/2/2020. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vijay Bedasie. (Osborn, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vijay Bedasie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney) (Osborn, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedasie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vijay Bedasie
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Dennis Canning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?