Abruzzo Docg Inc. et. al. v. Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company et. al.
Plaintiff: Abruzzo Docg Inc., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., MASA NY, LLC doing business as BAR MASA & MASA, SRG NYP, LLC, Aemal, LLC, UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC doing business as PIG & KHAO, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC doing business as TONY'S DI NAPOLI 1081 3RD AVENUE, NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC doing business as ROSEMARY'S, HRK FOODS, INC. doing business as NAYA, IL RIFUGIO INC doing business as TALLUCCI E VINO, MANNAGGIA INC. doing business as TARALLUCCI E VINO, RHLP 45 LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC doing business as TONY'S DI NAPOLI 147 W 43RD STREET, LITTLE WISCO LLC doing business as FEDORA, Fox SRJ LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC doing business as THE RIBBON, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC doing business as DIVE BAR 106, CITY WINERY LLC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC doing business as JAVELINA, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC. doing business as THE DL AND DINNER ON LUDLOW, ST. HELENE LLC doing business as BAR SARDINE, 125 HOSPITALITY LLC doing business as THE GROOVE, G&L Restaurant, LLC doing business as Loring Place, 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP doing business as THE BOX, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, Big Daddy's II LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC. doing business as GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC doing business as SMITH & MILLS, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC doing business as Khe-Yo, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP doing business as DUKE'S ORIGINAL ROADHOUSE, 1 PERRY LLC doing business as ROBY'S, WHANY LLC doing business as CAFE WHA?, RHLP 284 LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC doing business as JEFFREY'S GROCERY, SRG 1, LLC, IDA GOTIIAM, LLC doing business as DELL'ANIMA, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC doing business as WARREN 77, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC. doing business as ESS-A-BAGEL, Global Dining, Inc. of California, STOUT, INC, RACINES NYC LLC, George Marcell LLC doing business as Fairfax, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC. doing business as DIVE BAR, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC doing business as TARALLUCCI E VINO, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP doing business as SAMMY'S ORIGINAL SHRIMP BOX, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC doing business as BIG DADDY'S, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD. doing business as BROADWAY DIVE BAR, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, NAYA EXPRESS, INC. doing business as Naya, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC doing business as Quality Branded, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, YVES, LLC doing business as HOLY GROUND, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION doing business as Sammy's Fish Box Restaurant, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION doing business as SEASHORE RESTAURANT, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC doing business as ANFORA, TITO ROCKS LLC, 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC doing business as KAPPO MASA, GG Campbell, LLC doing business as The Campbell, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC doing business as TINY'S, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP doing business as EJ's Luncheonette, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC doing business as Farmer & The Fish, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC doing business as JOSEPH LEONARD, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC doing business as JAVELINA, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD. doing business as DALLAS BBQ 132 SECOND AVE, LA VECCHIA LLC doing business as TARALLUCCI E VINO, SKOL CORP, EMPORIUM SF LLC, HH BOWEN LLC doing business as HARLEM HOOKAH, Food For Junior's Inc., Broadway SRJ LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC doing business as SWEETWATER SOCIAL, 8TH AND 42ND LLC doing business as PATRICK'S, 24 5TH AVE LLC doing business as CLAUDETTE, THREE HOOPLES, LTD. doing business as BROADWAY DIVE BAR, MF PEASANT, LLC doing business as PEASANT RESTAURANT, 389 Broome LLC doing business as GOLDBAR, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC. doing business as Naya, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC and 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC
Defendant: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, Wesco Insurance Company, ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Aspen American Insurance Company, BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED, Seneca Insurance Company, Inc., HDI Global Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company, ARGO MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, Axis Insurance Company, Greenwich Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company, SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD, Scottsdale Insurance Company, CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, TOKIO MARINE-KILN SYNDICATES LIMITED, Strathmore Insurance Company, SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, XL Insurance America, Inc., United National Insurance Company, WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, United Specialty Insurance Company, LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, Utica First Insurance Company, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company, ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04160
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan MacDonald on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (MacDonald, Ryan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Burke on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Burke, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Russell Sever on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Sever, Jay)
October 27, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Myers on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Myers, Katie)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #138 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Jay Sever, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 30, 2020, Mr. Sever shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Sever shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Sever shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/23/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #139 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Katie Myers, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 30, 2020, Ms. Myers shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Myers shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Myers shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/23/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Millea on behalf of Greenwich Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Millea, Dan)
October 22, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13569838. by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support and supporitng Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service) (Myers, Katie)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #135 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Ryan MacDonald, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 29, 2020, Mr. MacDonald shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. MacDonald shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. MacDonald shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/22/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #134 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorney Matthew Burke, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 29, 2020, Mr. Burke shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Burke shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Burke shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/22/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney -- Dan Millea, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 29, 2020, Mr. Millea shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Millea shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Millea shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/22/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #137 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is denied without prejudice to the movant's right to seek reconsideration in conformity with this court's local rules, which require that an application for admission pro hac vice include a properly sworn and notarized affidavit stating (a) whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony, (b) whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court, (c) whether there are any disciplinary proceedings presently against the applicant, and (d) the facts and circumstances surrounding any affirmative responses to (a) through (c). See Loc. Civ. R. 1.3(c). If the applicant seeks reconsideration, she must do so no later than November 5, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/22/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply -- The motion is granted. The plaintiffs shall file their consolidated reply in support of their motion to remand by November 9, 2020. The defendants shall file their reply in support of their motions to sever by November 16, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/22/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13568710. by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support and supporting Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service) (Sever, Jay)
October 22, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13567536. by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support and supporting Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service) (Myers, Katie)
October 21, 2020 Filing 136 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC. (Creelan, Jeremy)
October 21, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan B. MacDonald Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13561042. by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Hollywood, Meegan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13560977. by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Hollywood, Meegan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 133 Letter to all counsel accompanying exchange of remand and severance briefs by SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY (Miller, Farrell)
October 21, 2020 Filing 132 Letter All counsel of record by United Specialty Insurance Company (Siegel, Lee)
October 20, 2020 Filing 131 Letter Regarding Joinder to and Notice of Motion to Sever Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (Steinke, Douglas)
October 20, 2020 Filing 130 Letter re Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Remand and Motion to Sever by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Michael, Charles)
October 20, 2020 Filing 129 Letter to Counsel re: 1) Joinder in Defendant Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Companys Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and Request for Limited Discovery and 2) Joinder in Motion to Sever filed by Defendants Chubb Custom Insurance Company and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America by WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Lewin, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Filing 128 Letter to Counsel re: 1) Joinder in Defendant Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Request for Limited Discovery and 2) Joinder in Motion to Sever filed by Defendants Chubb Custom Insurance Company and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America by ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY (Lewin, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Filing 127 Letter to all Counsel re Joinder in Motions by Axis Insurance Company (Pickett, Daniel)
October 20, 2020 Filing 126 Letter to all Counsel re Joinder by First Mercury Insurance Company (Young, Joanna)
October 20, 2020 Filing 125 Letter to Counsel re:Notice of Joinder in Motion to Sever and Memorandum of Law in Support there of and Notice of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company (Luo, Catharine)
October 20, 2020 Filing 124 Letter to Counsel re Joinder in Motion to Sever by United National Insurance Company (Vergara, Rafael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 123 Letter to Counsel re: Joinder in Motion to Sever and Opposition to Remand by NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, United Specialty Insurance Company (Arbitrio, Michelle)
October 20, 2020 Filing 122 Letter to Counsel re Joinder in Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by United National Insurance Company (Vergara, Rafael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 121 Letter to Counsel re: Joinder to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Almeida, Barbara)
October 20, 2020 Filing 120 Letter - Cover Letter dated October 20, 2020 re: Defendant HDIs Joinder with Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by HDI Global Insurance Company (Silverberg, Philip)
October 20, 2020 Filing 119 Letter Cover Letter dated October 20, 2020 from Stephen E. Goldman to Plaintiffs Counsel re: Defendants Motions to Sever by ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company (Goldman, Stephen)
October 20, 2020 Filing 118 Letter to Counsel re: Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Remand and Motion to Sever by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Stankowski-booker, Isabella)
October 20, 2020 Filing 117 Letter to Counsel re: Motion to Sever by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Kalik, Lance)
October 20, 2020 Filing 116 Letter to Counsel re: Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Remand and Joinder in Support of Motion to Sever by ARGO MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, TOKIO MARINE-KILN SYNDICATES LIMITED (Fazio, Peter)
October 20, 2020 Filing 115 Letter re Ohio Security Insurance Company's Motion to Sever by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Hollywood, Meegan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 114 Letter to Counsel re Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Sever by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Hollywood, Meegan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 113 Letter to Counsel re: Motions to Sever and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Greenwich Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (Gonzalez, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 112 Letter to Counsel re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Rocco, Charles)
October 20, 2020 Filing 111 Letter to Counsel re Motion to Sever by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Almeida, Barbara)
October 16, 2020 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Ackerman, Wystan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Joinder in and Consent to Removal and Notice of Removal (Steinke, Douglas)
October 15, 2020 Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Silverberg, Philip)
October 15, 2020 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent HDI Global Network AG, Corporate Parent HDI Global SE, Corporate Parent Talanx AG for HDI Global Insurance Company. (Silverberg, Philip)
October 14, 2020 Filing 106 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13520186. by Greenwich Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Millea, Dan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Steinke on behalf of Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Steinke, Douglas)
October 13, 2020 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Stankowski-booker, Isabella)
October 8, 2020 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company. (Hauser, Sandra)
October 8, 2020 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Company, Inc. for United Specialty Insurance Company. (Siegel, Lee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Dolejsi on behalf of Greenwich Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Dolejsi, Nicholas)
October 7, 2020 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Watford Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Arch Capital Group Ltd. for WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lewin, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company for ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lewin, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- The motion is granted. Attorney Nicholas Dolejsi, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By October 14, 2020, Mr. Dolejsi shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Dolejsi shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Dolejsi shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/7/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lewin on behalf of ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (aty to be noticed) (Lewin, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenwich Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Other Affiliate XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Insurance America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd., Other Affiliate XL Bermuda Ltd., Other Affiliate XLIT Ltd., Other Affiliate Exel Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate AXA SA, Other Affiliate XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited for Greenwich Insurance Company. (Gonzalez, Matthew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XL Insurance America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Other Affiliate XL Reinsurance America, Inc., Other Affiliate Greenwich Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd., Other Affiliate XL Bermuda Ltd., Other Affiliate XLIT Ltd., Other Affiliate AXA SA, Other Affiliate Exel Holdings Ltd. for XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Matthew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Twin City Fire Insurance Company re: Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of KINGS, case number 514089/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13471905) (Michael, Charles) Modified on 10/6/2020 (Marziliano, August).
October 5, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD re: Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of KINGS, case number 514089/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13471833) (Michael, Charles) Modified on 10/6/2020 (Marziliano, August).
October 5, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Fire Insurance Company re: Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of KINGS, case number 514089/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13471417) (Michael, Charles) Modified on 10/6/2020 (Marziliano, August).
October 5, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael Vergara on behalf of United National Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Vergara, Rafael)
October 5, 2020 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (O'Leary, Jeremiah)
October 5, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE by United National Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, United Nationals Consent And Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - information from Pennsylvanias Department of State website, #2 Exhibit B - In Re: Covid-19 Business Interruption Protection Insurance Litigation, MDL No. 2942 (August 2020 Order, Dkt. # 772), #3 Supplement United Nationals Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Certificate of Service) (Vergara, Rafael)
October 5, 2020 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Almeida, Barbara)
October 5, 2020 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY. (Almeida, Barbara)
October 2, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE by SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY of Consent to Removal (Miller, Farrell)
October 2, 2020 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company identifying Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies Inc. for Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company. (Ackerman, Wystan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America identifying Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Ackerman, Wystan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate The Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Company, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Ackerman, Wystan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Paul Varga on behalf of Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Varga, Gregory)
October 2, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Ethan Haas on behalf of Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Haas, Marc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Daniel)
October 1, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13454494. by Greenwich Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dolejsi, Nicholas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strathmore Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company for Strathmore Insurance Company. (Haas, Marc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE by Scottsdale Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
September 30, 2020 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
September 29, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE by First Mercury Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, #2 Clerks Notice of Rule 73,,, Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Young, Joanna)
September 29, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE by Axis Insurance Company of Consent to Removal (Pickett, Daniel)
September 28, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Joinder in and Consent to Removal and Notice of Removal by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (Almeida, Barbara)
September 28, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenwich Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13431820) (Gonzalez, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XL Insurance America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13431777) (Gonzalez, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Sullivan on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Daniel)
September 25, 2020 Filing 69 Letter - Cover Letter dated September 25, 2020 from Jeremy M. Creelan to Counsel re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC (Creelan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC - Plaintiffs' Local Rule 81.1 Statement (Creelan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2020 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Global-Dining Inc. for Global Dining, Inc. of California. (Creelan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA of Consent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Consent to Removal) (O'Leary, Jeremiah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Ethan Haas on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Haas, Marc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Zagha on behalf of CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (aty to be noticed) (Zagha, Jonathan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah L. O'Leary on behalf of CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (aty to be noticed) (O'Leary, Jeremiah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE by ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Goldman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Goldman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE by Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Goldman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Goldman, Stephen)
September 25, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, #2 Clerks Notice of Rule 73,,, Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Varga, Gregory)
September 25, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Paul Varga on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (notification declined or already on case) (Varga, Gregory)
September 25, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allen Beer, Jr on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Beer, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Jon Kalik on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kalik, Lance)
September 25, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company's Consent and Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hollywood, Meegan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE by Ohio Security Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company's Consent and Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hollywood, Meegan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE by NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Consent/Joinder in Removal (Arbitrio, Michelle)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay -- The plaintiffs' request for scheduling relief is granted on consent and the subsequent motions for alternate forms of scheduling relief are therefore moot. The plaintiffs shall submit their motion to remand by September 25, 2020; the defendants shall respond and submit any threshold motions by October 20, 2020; the plaintiffs shall submit a consolidated reply on the remand motion and response to defense motions by November 2, 2020; and the defendants shall file any reply on their motions by November 9, 2020. The defendants shall file their respective responses to the Amended Complaint no later than 15 days after the court resolves the motions described above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/24/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Michael on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Michael, Charles)
September 23, 2020 Filing 50 Letter to The Honorable Margo K. Brodie and The Honorable James Orenstein by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Michael, Charles)
September 23, 2020 Filing 49 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company. (Hauser, Sandra)
September 23, 2020 Filing 48 Letter expressly consenting to Plaintiff's proposed schedule by HDI Global Insurance Company (Silverberg, Philip)
September 23, 2020 Filing 47 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Move to Dismiss by SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Farrell)
September 22, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE by WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, /Defendant Watford Specialty Insurance Company's Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Goulet, Chelsea)
September 22, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, /Defendant Arch Insurance Company's Notice of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Goulet, Chelsea)
September 22, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Goulet on behalf of ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (aty to be noticed) (Goulet, Chelsea)
September 22, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Brill on behalf of SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY (aty to be noticed) (Brill, Melissa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 42 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #39 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company. (Goldman, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Farrell J. Miller on behalf of SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY (aty to be noticed) (Miller, Farrell)
September 22, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint /Affidavits of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint w/ exhibits, filed by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC. (Ross, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 39 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company. (Goldman, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Lyn Young on behalf of First Mercury Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Young, Joanna)
September 22, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Almeida on behalf of CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (aty to be noticed) (Almeida, Barbara)
September 21, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Arbitrio on behalf of NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, United Specialty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance) (Arbitrio, Michelle)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #20 Motion to Stay -- In light of the report that some but not all defendants consent to the motion, any party opposing the request may submit a letter by September 23, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/21/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Vicere on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Vicere, Ashley)
September 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Pickett on behalf of Axis Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Pickett, Daniel)
September 18, 2020 Filing 33 Letter to The Honorable Margo K. Brodie and The Honorable James Orenstein supplementing Plaintiff's September 16, 2020 Letter Motion by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC (Creelan, Jeremy)
September 18, 2020 Filing 32 Letter to The Honorable Margo K. Brodie and The Honorable James Orenstein by CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Haas, Kevin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M Haas on behalf of CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (aty to be noticed) (Haas, Kevin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by HDI Global Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent or Joinder in Removal (Silverberg, Philip)
September 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip C. Silverberg on behalf of HDI Global Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Silverberg, Philip)
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Josiah Tyler Denson Butts on behalf of ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company (aty to be noticed) (Butts, Josiah)
September 17, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Arch Specialty Insurance Company (Stankowski-booker, Isabella)
September 17, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Paul Varga on behalf of ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company (aty to be noticed) (Varga, Gregory)
September 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Ethan Haas on behalf of ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company (aty to be noticed) (Haas, Marc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/17/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company (aty to be noticed) (Ackerman, Wystan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (aty to be noticed) (Ackerman, Wystan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. Goldman on behalf of ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, Strathmore Insurance Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company (aty to be noticed) (Goldman, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joining in Briefing Schedule Request and Staying Time to Respond to Amended Complaint as referenced in Document #20 by ARGO MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, TOKIO MARINE-KILN SYNDICATES LIMITED. (Fazio, Peter)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 Letter MOTION to Stay / Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Stay Defendants' Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule by 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP, 1 PERRY LLC, 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD., 125 HOSPITALITY LLC, 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC, 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC, 1626 SRJ, LLC, 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC, 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC, 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC, 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC, 24 5TH AVE LLC, 34 8TH AVENUE LLC, 389 Broome LLC, 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC, 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP, 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC, 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC, 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC, 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC, 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC, 8TH AND 42ND LLC, 93 LUDLOW STREET INC., 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC, AURIFY BRANDS, LLC, Abruzzo Docg Inc., Aemal, LLC, BLACK TAP GROUP LLC, BOBO RESTAURANT LLC, Bea's Tavern, Inc., Big Daddy's II LLC, Broadway SRJ LLC, C.S.L.L. REST. CORP, CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC, CITY WINERY LLC, EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC, EMPORIUM SF LLC, ESS-A-BAGEL, INC., FGNY PARENTCO, LLC, FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION, Food For Junior's Inc., Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC, Fox SRJ LLC, G&L Restaurant, LLC, GG Campbell, LLC, GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC., George Marcell LLC, Global Dining, Inc. of California, Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC, HAPPY COOKING LLC, HH BOWEN LLC, HRK FOODS, INC., IDA GOTIIAM, LLC, IL RIFUGIO INC, JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC, KIO RESTAURANT, LLC, L'ATELIER NYC LLC, LA VECCHIA LLC, LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC., LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC, LITTLE WISCO LLC, MANNAGGIA INC., MASA NY, LLC, MF PEASANT, LLC, MONOPOLIO LLC, NAYA EXPRESS II, INC., NAYA EXPRESS, INC., NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC, NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC, NORTH 43RD LLC, PENMANSHIP LLC, RACINES NYC LLC, RHLP 284 LLC, RHLP 45 LLC, SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP, SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION, SEINFELD SQUARED LLC, SKOL CORP, SRG 1, LLC, SRG 570 Lex, LLC, SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC, SRG NYP, LLC, ST. HELENE LLC, STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC, STOUT, INC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC, THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC, THREE HOOPLES, LTD., TITO ROCKS LLC, TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD., UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC, WHANY LLC, YVES, LLC. (Creelan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/24/2020 to correct event type (Almonte, Kelly).
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by ARGO MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED, TOKIO MARINE-KILN SYNDICATES LIMITED re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Consent/Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Policy) (Fazio, Peter)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond/move by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Stankowski-booker, Isabella)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Catharine Luo on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Luo, Catharine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Meegan F. Hollywood on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Hollywood, Meegan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, / Notice of Consent or Joinder in Removal (Western World Insurance Company) (Hauser, Sandra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,, / Notice of Consent or Joinder in Removal (Lexington Insurance Company) (Hauser, Sandra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Hauser, Sandra)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Jon Straub on behalf of Lexington Insurance Company, Western World Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Straub, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; Defendant United Specialty Insurance Co. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 2, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/10/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Specialty Insurance Company Notice of Consent to Removal (Siegel, Lee)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Barnas on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Barnas, Brian)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Siegel, Lee)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and ORDER terminating as moot #5 Supplemental Motion -- The motion is granted; defendant Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Co. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 2, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/10/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Creelan, Jeremy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Micah Creelan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Creelan, Jeremy)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Ross on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Ross, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Order, by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rocco, Charles)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer -- I respectfully direct the plaintiffs to respond to the defendant Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Co.'s letter motion, Docket Entry #4 , by September 11, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/9/2020. (Oliner, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rocco, Charles)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from SUPREME COURT KINGS COUNTY, case number 514089/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13318306) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #41 Exhibit AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #42 Exhibit 1, #43 Exhibit 1, #44 Exhibit 2, #45 Exhibit 2, #46 Exhibit 3, #47 Exhibit 3, #48 Exhibit 4, #49 Exhibit 4, #50 Exhibit 5, #51 Exhibit 6, #52 Exhibit 7, #53 Exhibit 8, #54 Exhibit 9, #55 Exhibit 10, #56 Exhibit 11, #57 Exhibit 12, #58 Exhibit 13, #59 Exhibit 14, #60 Exhibit 15, #61 Exhibit 16, #62 Exhibit 17, #63 Exhibit 18, #64 Exhibit 18, #65 Exhibit 19, #66 Exhibit 20, #67 Exhibit 20, #68 Exhibit 21, #69 Exhibit 21, #70 Exhibit 22, #71 Exhibit 22, #72 Exhibit 23, #73 Exhibit 23, #74 Exhibit 24, #75 Exhibit 24, #76 Exhibit 25, #77 Exhibit 25, #78 Exhibit 26, #79 Exhibit 26, #80 Exhibit 27, #81 Exhibit 27, #82 Exhibit 28, #83 Exhibit 29, #84 Exhibit 30, #85 Exhibit 31, #86 Exhibit 32, #87 Exhibit 32, #88 Exhibit 33, #89 Exhibit 33, #90 Exhibit 34, #91 Exhibit 35, #92 Exhibit 36, #93 Exhibit 37, #94 Exhibit 38, #95 Exhibit 39, #96 Exhibit 39, #97 Exhibit 40, #98 Exhibit 41, #99 Exhibit 41, #100 Exhibit 42, #101 Exhibit 43, #102 Exhibit 44, #103 Exhibit 45, #104 Exhibit 45, #105 Exhibit 46, #106 Exhibit 47, #107 Exhibit 47, #108 Exhibit 48, #109 Exhibit 49, #110 Exhibit 50, #111 Exhibit 51, #112 Exhibit 51, #113 Exhibit 52, #114 Exhibit 53, #115 Exhibit 54, #116 Exhibit 55, #117 Exhibit 55, #118 Exhibit 56, #119 Exhibit 57, #120 Exhibit 57, #121 Exhibit 58, #122 Exhibit 59, #123 Exhibit 59, #124 Exhibit 60, #125 Exhibit 61, #126 Exhibit 62, #127 Exhibit 63, #128 Exhibit 64, #129 Exhibit 65, #130 Exhibit B NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #131 Civil Cover Sheet, #132 RULE 71 STATEMENT) (Rocco, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abruzzo Docg Inc. et. al. v. Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abruzzo Docg Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FGNY PARENTCO, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bea's Tavern, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASA NY, LLC doing business as BAR MASA & MASA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRG NYP, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aemal, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNION SQUARE HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W BBQ HOLDINGS, INC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1650 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, INC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 68 CLINTON RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC doing business as PIG & KHAO
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 64TH & 3RD ENTERPRISES LLC doing business as TONY'S DI NAPOLI 1081 3RD AVENUE
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAYA HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 18 GREENWICH AVENUE LLC doing business as ROSEMARY'S
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRK FOODS, INC. doing business as NAYA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IL RIFUGIO INC doing business as TALLUCCI E VINO
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANNAGGIA INC. doing business as TARALLUCCI E VINO
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHLP 45 LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH 43RD LLC doing business as TONY'S DI NAPOLI 147 W 43RD STREET
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITTLE WISCO LLC doing business as FEDORA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox SRJ LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE 44, LLC doing business as THE RIBBON
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEINFELD SQUARED LLC doing business as DIVE BAR 106
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY WINERY LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVELINA TEX-MEX LLC doing business as JAVELINA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 93 LUDLOW STREET INC. doing business as THE DL AND DINNER ON LUDLOW
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. HELENE LLC doing business as BAR SARDINE
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 125 HOSPITALITY LLC doing business as THE GROOVE
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&L Restaurant, LLC doing business as Loring Place
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 189 CHRYSTIE PARTNERS LP doing business as THE BOX
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L'ATELIER NYC LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPTAIN HADDOCK LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Daddy's II LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR INC. doing business as GRAND CENTRAL OYSTER BAR
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBO RESTAURANT LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NO MOORE OYSTERS, LLC doing business as SMITH & MILLS
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRG 570 Lex, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIO RESTAURANT, LLC doing business as Khe-Yo
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 560 THIRD AVENUE GROCERY CORP doing business as DUKE'S ORIGINAL ROADHOUSE
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1 PERRY LLC doing business as ROBY'S
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHANY LLC doing business as CAFE WHA?
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHLP 284 LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENMANSHIP LLC doing business as JEFFREY'S GROCERY
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRG 1, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDA GOTIIAM, LLC doing business as DELL'ANIMA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 77 WARREN FOODS, LLC doing business as WARREN 77
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESS-A-BAGEL, INC. doing business as ESS-A-BAGEL
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Dining, Inc. of California
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STOUT, INC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACINES NYC LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Marcell LLC doing business as Fairfax
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LE-SE AMSTERDAM 732 RESTAURANT, INC. doing business as DIVE BAR
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 53RD STREET FINE DINING, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONELLI RESTAURANTS LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONOPOLIO LLC doing business as TARALLUCCI E VINO
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMMY'S S.B. REST. CORP doing business as SAMMY'S ORIGINAL SHRIMP BOX
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 239 PARK AVENUE SOUTH ASSOCIATES LLC doing business as BIG DADDY'S
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1626 SRJ, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 101 WEST 75 BAR AND REST. ENTERPRISES, LTD. doing business as BROADWAY DIVE BAR
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRG CHURCH STREET, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAYA EXPRESS, INC. doing business as Naya
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLACK TAP GROUP LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourth Wall Restaurants, LLC doing business as Quality Branded
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE RIBBON WORLDWIDE LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVES, LLC doing business as HOLY GROUND
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FISH BOX RESTAURANT CORPORATION doing business as Sammy's Fish Box Restaurant
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEASHORE RESTAURANT CORPORATION doing business as SEASHORE RESTAURANT
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 34 8TH AVENUE LLC doing business as ANFORA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TITO ROCKS LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 976 MADISON RESTAURANT, LLC doing business as KAPPO MASA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GG Campbell, LLC doing business as The Campbell
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 135 WEST B FOOD & DRINK. LLC doing business as TINY'S
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.S.L.L. REST. CORP doing business as EJ's Luncheonette
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gramercy Farmer & The Fish LLC doing business as Farmer & The Fish
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURIFY BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAPPY COOKING LLC doing business as JOSEPH LEONARD
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1395 SECOND AVENUE RESTAURANT LLC doing business as JAVELINA
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWO AND EIGHT GOURMET,LTD. doing business as DALLAS BBQ 132 SECOND AVE
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA VECCHIA LLC doing business as TARALLUCCI E VINO
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKOL CORP
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPORIUM SF LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH BOWEN LLC doing business as HARLEM HOOKAH
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Food For Junior's Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadway SRJ LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPORIUM OAKLAND LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MIND HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 643 BROADWAY HOLDINGS LLC doing business as SWEETWATER SOCIAL
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 8TH AND 42ND LLC doing business as PATRICK'S
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 24 5TH AVE LLC doing business as CLAUDETTE
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THREE HOOPLES, LTD. doing business as BROADWAY DIVE BAR
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MF PEASANT, LLC doing business as PEASANT RESTAURANT
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 389 Broome LLC doing business as GOLDBAR
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAYA EXPRESS II, INC. doing business as Naya
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 228 WEST 10TH STREET, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 883 SIXTH AVENUE, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Represented By: Jeremy Micah Creelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles J. Rocco
Represented By: Ashley Vicere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMIRAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Denson Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Denson Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Steinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip C. Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Joanna Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Catharine Luo
Represented By: Sandra Denise Hauser
Represented By: Timothy Jon Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Denson Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Meegan F. Hollywood
Represented By: Matthew M Burke
Represented By: Ryan MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Meegan F. Hollywood
Represented By: Matthew M Burke
Represented By: Ryan MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeremiah L. O'Leary
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Zagha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARGO MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Barbara Almeida
Represented By: Kevin M Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Isabella Karlina Stankowski-booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michelle M. Arbitrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Luis Gonzalez
Represented By: Dan Millea
Represented By: Nicholas Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel F. Sullivan
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Catharine Luo
Represented By: Sandra Denise Hauser
Represented By: Timothy Jon Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD
Represented By: Charles A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Beer, Jr.
Represented By: Katie Myers
Represented By: Jay Russell Sever
Represented By: Lance Jon Kalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB CUSTOM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Barbara Almeida
Represented By: Kevin M Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOKIO MARINE-KILN SYNDICATES LIMITED
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strathmore Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Denson Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOMPO AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Farrell J. Miller
Represented By: Melissa Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Luis Gonzalez
Represented By: Dan Millea
Represented By: Nicholas Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATFORD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Lewin
Represented By: Chelsea Goulet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee S. Siegel
Represented By: Michelle M. Arbitrio
Represented By: Brian D. Barnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MANAGING AGENCY LIMITED
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica First Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Excess and Surplus Lines Company
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Represented By: Marc Ethan Haas
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Stephen E. Goldman
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Denson Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Lewin
Represented By: Chelsea Goulet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip C. Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?