FMTB BH LLC v. 1988 Morris Avenue LLC et al
Appellee: 1974 Morris Avenue LLC, 700 Beck Street, LLC, 1988 Morris Avenue LLC, 1143 Forest Avenue LLC and 1821 Topping Avenue LLC
Appellant: FMTB BH LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04296
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FMTB BH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Reply, #2 Exhibit A) (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 1143 Forest Avenue LLC, 1821 Topping Avenue LLC, 1974 Morris Avenue LLC, 1988 Morris Avenue LLC, 700 Beck Street, LLC. (Markowitz, Brian)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FMTB BH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Zelmanovitz in support of the motion, #2 Exhibit A in support: Decision of Bank. Ct., #3 Exhibit B in support: Order dated Sept 2 2020, #4 Exhibit C in support: Assumption Order, #5 Exhibit D in support: TOE Notice, #6 Exhibit E in support: Email from Judge Trust) (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FMTB BH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The court has reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters concerning plaintiff-appellee's anticipated motion to dismiss and determined that a pre-motion conference is not necessary. The court therefore grants plaintiff-appellee permission to bring the motion. Plaintiff-appellee's motion and supporting papers shall be filed electronically no later than October 30, 2020; defendants-appellants' opposition papers shall be filed electronically no later than November 9, 2020; plaintiff-appellee's reply papers, if any, shall be filed electronically no later than November 13, 2020. This schedule may be altered only with the permission of the court. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/21/2020. (Roeck, Victoria)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Letter Response to the Court Addressing Pending Appeal by 1143 Forest Avenue LLC, 1821 Topping Avenue LLC, 1974 Morris Avenue LLC, 1988 Morris Avenue LLC, 700 Beck Street, LLC (Markowitz, Brian)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order (CORRECTED) ORDER: This court has reviewed Judge Craig's order, dated September 30, 2020, authorizing the Debtor to assume the contracts and granting related relief to the parties. The appellants are ordered to advise this court, in the form of a letter uploaded to ECF no later than October 13, 2020, as to why the appeal should not be dismissed as moot. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/9/2020. (Schnell, Samantha)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: This court has reviewed Judge Craig's order, dated September 30, 2020, authorizing the Debtor to assume the contracts and granting related relief to the parties. The appellants are ordered to advise this court, in the form of a letter uploaded to ECF no later than October 12, 2020, as to why the appeal should not be dismissed as moot. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/8/2020. (Schnell, Samantha)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 1143 Forest Avenue LLC, 1821 Topping Avenue LLC, 1974 Morris Avenue LLC, 1988 Morris Avenue LLC, 700 Beck Street, LLC, Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff-Appellee's Request for a Pre-Motion Conference by 1143 Forest Avenue LLC, 1821 Topping Avenue LLC, 1974 Morris Avenue LLC, 1988 Morris Avenue LLC, 700 Beck Street, LLC (Markowitz, Brian)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Appellant has submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss the appeal #3 . Appellees' counsel is reminded that, under Judge Ross's Individual Motion Practices, appellees are required to file a responsive letter addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motion within seven business days from service of appellant's letter, on or before October 1, 2020. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/22/2020. (Schnell, Samantha)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Letter requesting pre-motion conference by FMTB BH LLC (Zelmanovitz, Joseph)
September 14, 2020 Notice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-1052., filed by FMTB BH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Record, #2 Opinion/Decision, #3 Order, #4 Affidavit, #5 Notice to Parties) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FMTB BH LLC v. 1988 Morris Avenue LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 1974 Morris Avenue LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 700 Beck Street, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 1988 Morris Avenue LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 1143 Forest Avenue LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 1821 Topping Avenue LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FMTB BH LLC
Represented By: Joseph Zelmanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?