Erdem v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Naz Damla Erdem
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04304
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 Letter Joint Letter in Connection with Initial Status Conference by Naz Damla Erdem (Schlanger, Daniel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order Civil Case Management Plan by Naz Damla Erdem (Schlanger, Daniel)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for October 28, 2020 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Turcotte, Christopher)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #9 . This Court does not wait for an answer to hold the Initial Status Conference as the answer is rarely a useful document in planning the case. Therefore the conference is adjourned to 11/17/2020 at 4:00 pm. This adjournment will give defense counsel plenty of time to figure out what happened here.The Initial Status Conference will be held by telephone. Parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. They are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #5 and shall file on the docket a completed case management prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/21/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Turcotte, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Turcotte on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Turcotte, Christopher)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Adam Schlanger on behalf of Naz Damla Erdem (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 10/28/2020 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/15/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Naz Damla Erdem against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13359858 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Naz Damla Erdem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons) (Taubes, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erdem v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naz Damla Erdem
Represented By: Isaac M Taubes
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher B. Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?