Geico Indemnity Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company as Subrogee of Karen Smith Edwards and Geico Indemnity Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv04307
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d). The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). An Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled after an Answer is filed. The hearing will occur approximately 120 days after filing of the Answer. (Credle, Rita)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/23/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Ordered by Clerk of Court on 9/23/2020. (Marziliano, August)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Geico Indemnity Company. (Elem, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 US Attorney General summons, #2 US Postal summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Brooks, Other Affiliate Shaw Industries, Other Affiliate Heinz, Other Affiliate Benjamin Moore & Co., Other Affiliate United States Liability Insurance Group, Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Geico Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Choice Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Acme Brick Company, Other Affiliate Applied Underwriters, Other Affiliate Ben Bridge Jeweler, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Energy Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance, Other Affiliate BH Media Group, Other Affiliate BoatU.S., Other Affiliate Borsheim's Fine Jewelry, Other Affiliate Buffalo NEWS, Buffalo NY, Other Affiliate BNSF, Other Affiliate Business Wire, Other Affiliate Central States Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Clayton Homes, Other Affiliate CORT Business Services, Other Affiliate CTB Inc., Other Affiliate Fechheimer Brothers Company, Other Affiliate FlightSafety, Other Affiliate Forest River, Other Affiliate Fruit of the Loom Companies, Other Affiliate Garan Incorporated, Other Affiliate Gateway Underwriters Agency, Other Affiliate General Re, Other Affiliate Guard Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Helzberg Diamonds, Other Affiliate H.H. Brown Shoe Group, Other Affiliate HomeServices of America, Inc., Other Affiliate International Dairy Queen, Inc., Other Affiliate IMC International Metalworking Companies, Other Affiliate Johns Manville, Other Affiliate Jordan's Furniture, Other Affiliate Justin Brands, Other Affiliate Larson-Juhl, Other Affiliate Lubrizol Corporation, Other Affiliate Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate McLane Company, Other Affiliate Medical Protective, Other Affiliate MiTek Inc., Other Affiliate Nebraska Furniture Mart, Other Affiliate NetJets, Other Affiliate Oriental Trading Company, Other Affiliate The Pampered Chef, Other Affiliate RC Willey Home Furnishings, Other Affiliate Richline Group, Other Affiliate Scott Fetzer Companies, Other Affiliate See's Candies, Other Affiliate Star Furniture, Other Affiliate TTI Inc., Other Affiliate XTRA Corporation, Other Affiliate GEICO Casualty Company, Other Affiliate GEICO General Insurance Company for Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Corporations List) (Elem, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Geico Indemnity Company (Elem, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Geico Indemnity Company (Elem, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Geico Indemnity Company (Elem, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Geico Indemnity Company (Elem, Richard)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13401263 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Elem, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico Indemnity Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company as Subrogee of Karen Smith Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard Levi Elem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?