Shoemaker v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lenard Shoemaker
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv04381
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Denso International America, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP et al. (Abraham, Joshua)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Gordon Cooney, Jr terminated. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/6/2020. (Dixon, Roy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. by Toyota Motor North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.) (Hooper, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Toyota Motor North America Inc.. (Hooper, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kristen Shook on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shook, Jessica)
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric F. Gladbach on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gladbach, Eric)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hooper on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hooper, John)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Toyota Motor North America Inc. answer due 11/4/2020. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/30/2020. (Dixon, Roy)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00869. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 18, 2020 The case of Shoemaker v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al, has been transferred from Middle District of Pennsylvania to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv4381. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: #14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case and Lift the Stay (CORRECTED) filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. is GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case to the Untied States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. See Order for additional details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/15/20. (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case and Lift the Stay (CORRECTED) by Toyota Motor North America, Inc..(Cooney, J.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the EDPA and Lift the Stay by Toyota Motor North America, Inc..(Cooney, J.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay pending JPML Ruling. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/21/20 (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Ruling by Toyota Motor North America, Inc..(Cooney, J.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Noah Axler re Status of Service of Complaint. (Axler, Noah) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order approving #8 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plea. ORDERED that the deadline fo rthe Defendant to file Answer, move or otherwise plead extended to 8/3/20. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 7/1/20. (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc., to Respond to Complaint by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor North America, Inc... (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Gordon Cooney, Jr on behalf of Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Cooney, J.) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Lenard Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions)(bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Transfer of Actions to the ED of MI, filed by Lenard Shoemaker.(bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/9/20. (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5105330), filed by Lenard Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoemaker v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: John Hooper
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Represented By: Jessica Kristen Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenard Shoemaker
Represented By: Noah Axler
Represented By: Thomas E. Loeser
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Stanley W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?