United States of America v. Two Hundred And Eighty Thousand Dollars And Zero Cents ($280,000.00), More Or Less, In United States Currency, And Money Orders In The Amount Of Forty-Six Thousand Four Hundred Dollars And Zero C et al
Plaintiff: United State of America
Defendant: Two Hundred And Eighty Thousand Dollars And Zero Cents ($280,000.00), More Or Less, In United States Currency, And Money Orders In The Amount Of Forty-Six Thousand Four Hundred Dollars And Zero C
Case Number: 1:2020cv04442
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WARRANT For Arrest of Articles In Rem. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/23/2020. (Greene, Donna)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Two Hundred And Eighty Thousand Dollars And Zero Cents ($280,000.00), More Or Less, In United States Currency, And Money Orders In The Amount Of Forty-Six Thousand Four Hundred Dollars And Zero C Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrnat for Arrest of Articles in Rem) (Almonte, Giselle)
September 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two Hundred And Eighty Thousand Dollars And Zero Cents ($280,000.00), More Or Less, In United States Currency, And Money Orders In The Amount Of Forty-Six Thousand Four Hundred Dollars And Zero C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Hundred And Eighty Thousand Dollars And Zero Cents ($280,000.00), More Or Less, In United States Currency, And Money Orders In The Amount Of Forty-Six Thousand Four Hundred Dollars And Zero C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United State of America
Represented By: Laura D. Mantell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?