Rodriguez v. Kohls Department Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brigida Rodriguez
Defendant: Capital One, N.A. and Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04517
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for December 8, 2020 at 4:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Capital One, N.A.. (Verrilli, Gregg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kohls Department Stores, Inc.. (Verrilli, Gregg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg L. Verrilli on behalf of Capital One, N.A., Kohls Department Stores, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Verrilli, Gregg)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Capital One, N.A. answer due 11/5/2020; Kohls Department Stores, Inc. answer due 11/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/16/2020. (Ramirez, Alexia)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Capital One, N.A., Kohls Department Stores, Inc.. (Brigandi, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Brigandi on behalf of Capital One, N.A., Kohls Department Stores, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Brigandi, John)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brigida Rodriguez. Kohls Department Stores, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Kim, Yongmoon)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brigida Rodriguez. Capital One, N.A. served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Kim, Yongmoon)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Capital summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One, N.A., Kohls Department Stores, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13411380 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Brigida Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Kohls Department Stores, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons for Capital One, N.A.) (Kim, Yongmoon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Kohls Department Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: John E. Brigandi
Represented By: Gregg L. Verrilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Brigandi
Represented By: Gregg L. Verrilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigida Rodriguez
Represented By: Yongmoon Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?