Zuo v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yang Zuo
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc. and Toyota Motor Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv04624
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Denso International America, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP et al. (Abraham, Joshua)
October 1, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re. #1 . Defendant's Answer is due by 11/4/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/1/2020. (Bayer, Sarah)
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Toyota Motor North America Inc.. (Hooper, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kristen Shook on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shook, Jessica)
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hooper on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hooper, John)
September 29, 2020 Filing 19 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:20-cv-06607. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 29, 2020 The case of Zuo v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al, has been transferred from District of New Jersey to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv4624. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT ORDER Lifting Stay and granting #15 Joint Motion to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/15/2020. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT ORDER pending JPML Ruling re #7 Defendant's Letter with Proposed Consent Order. Defendant TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. shall file its response to the Complaint on or before (20) days after the JPML issues its ruling. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/29/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of New York by TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (GLADBACH, ERIC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JOHN HOOPER: $ 150, receipt number NEW043251 (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 10/26/20 at 1pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/29/20. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CHIRALI V. PATEL on behalf of YANG ZUO (PATEL, CHIRALI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2020. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Parties are to disregard the docket entry moving the 7/29/20 conference to 2:30pm, it was entered in error and will be removed from the docket. The Court will reschedule the conference to 2pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/20. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Application/Petition for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of JOHN P. HOOPER, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/2020. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION/PETITION for ADMISSION OF JOHN HOOPER PRO HAC VICE for by TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Eric Gladbach, #2 Certification of John Hooper, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GLADBACH, ERIC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference with the parties on 7/29/20 at 3pm.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/20/20. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Defendant Toyota Motor North America Inc. with Proposed Joint Consent Order Staying Case. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GLADBACH, ERIC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD that the deadline for Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. to file a responsive answer, move or otherwise plead with respect to the Complaint is extended to 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/1/2020. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Defendant Toyota Motor North America Inc. with Proposed Joint Consent Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GLADBACH, ERIC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. identifying Toyota Motor Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GLADBACH, ERIC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC FRANCIS GLADBACH on behalf of TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. (GLADBACH, ERIC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10876550) with JURY DEMAND, filed by YANG ZUO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(CECCHI, JAMES) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuo v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Zuo
Represented By: Chirali V. Patel
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Represented By: Jessica Kristen Shook
Represented By: John Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?