Tordjman v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Isaac Tordjman
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation and Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04628
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Denso International America, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00629-WFK-CLP et al. (Abraham, Joshua)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Toyota Motor North America Inc.. (Hooper, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kristen Shook on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shook, Jessica)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric F. Gladbach on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gladbach, Eric)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hooper on behalf of Toyota Motor North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hooper, John)
September 30, 2020 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 11/4/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/30/2020. (Caggiano, Diana)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 29, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:20-cv-80871. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 29, 2020 The case of Tordjman v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al, has been transferred from Southern District of Florida to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 20cv4628. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER. ORDER granting #10 Motion to Lift the Stay and Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND TRANSFER CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK by Isaac Tordjman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grossman, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DEEMING MOTION WITHDRAWN AND VACATING THE SEPTEMBER 24, 2020, HEARING SESSION ORDER re: MDL 2956. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. This case is STAYED. The Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motion AS MOOT. Any party may move to lift the stay upon a ruling from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Any motion to lift the stay must be filed within 5 days of the ruling from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Motions terminated: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Aaronson, Leah) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Aaronson, Leah) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Courtesy Copy of Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Eastern District of Michigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 sent to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service)(mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Isaac Tordjman re #1 Complaint filed by Isaac Tordjman (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Grossman, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12957163, filed by Isaac Tordjman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grossman, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 9/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tordjman v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Tordjman
Represented By: Stuart Z. Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Wagner Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc.
Represented By: Leah Aaronson
Represented By: John Hooper
Represented By: Jessica Kristen Shook
Represented By: Eric F. Gladbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?