Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C., John Vernon Crues, M.D., John Melnick, M.D., Radnet Management, Inc. and Radnet, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04698
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial/telephone conference will be held on 1/29/2021 at 3:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 3:00 P.M. conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 1/29/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/18/2020. (Manson, Eddie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C., Radnet Management, Inc., Radnet, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Radnet, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Radnet Management, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. John Vernon Crues, M.D. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. John Melnick, M.D. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Melnick, M.D., John Vernon Crues, M.D., Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C., Radnet Management, Inc., Radnet, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Whitcher on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Whitcher, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Garcia-Vieux on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (King, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (King, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Melnick, M.D., John Vernon Crues, M.D., Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C., Radnet Management, Inc., Radnet, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13460265 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10) (King, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenox Hill Radiology & Medical Imaging Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vernon Crues, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Melnick, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radnet Management, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radnet, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Michael W Whitcher
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Jasmine Garcia-Vieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?