Cobb v. NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn et al
Plaintiff: Chester Cobb
Defendant: Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis and NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn
Case Number: 1:2020cv04776
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held in this case at 3:00 p.m. on December 21, 2020, before United States Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833. ***The completed questionnaire must be filed with the Court by December 18, 2020. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/1/2020. (Proujansky, Josh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Del Rey-Cone, Christie)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn. (Del Rey-Cone, Christie)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn, filed by Chester Cobb. (Gluck, Joel)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Order: Defendants' motion at #8 for a pre-motion conference is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted until 11/09/2020 to amend his complaint. Following that date, defendants may file a new motion for a pre-motion conference if they still intend to seek dismissal of this action. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/26/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Chester Cobb. (Gluck, Joel)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response will be due by 10/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 10/19/2020. (Liss, Jeremy)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Chester Cobb. (Gluck, Joel)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn. (Del Rey-Cone, Christie)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Letter regarding plaintiff's counsel's information by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn (Tomasco, Alison)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison L. Tomasco on behalf of Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn (aty to be noticed) (Tomasco, Alison)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn (Del Rey-Cone, Christie)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn (Del Rey-Cone, Christie)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jacquelyn Fox, Sara Galanis, NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn from Supreme COurt of the State of New York, Kings County, case number 508038/20. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13476095) (Del Rey-Cone, Christie)
October 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Fox
Represented By: Alison L. Tomasco
Represented By: Christie Del Rey-Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Galanis
Represented By: Alison L. Tomasco
Represented By: Christie Del Rey-Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Langone Hospital-Brooklyn
Represented By: Alison L. Tomasco
Represented By: Christie Del Rey-Cone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Cobb
Represented By: John M. Gluck
Represented By: Joel M. Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?