Teper v. Queensboro Volkswagen
Plaintiff: Leonora Teper
Defendant: Queensboro Volkswagen
Case Number: 1:2020cv04863
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Nicholas Saponara on behalf of Queensboro Volkswagen (aty to be noticed) (Saponara, David)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 . Defendant's time to answer is extended to 12/15/2020; telephonic initial status conference is adjourned to 12/15/2020 at 4:30 pm. Parties are directed to call the toll-free number 888-684-8852, enter access code 6427877# and security code 4863#. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements set forth at #5 and shall file on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/11/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and adjourn initial conference by Queensboro Volkswagen. (Aloe, Paul)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonora Teper. Queensboro Volkswagen served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Kasell, David)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/9/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Queensboro Volkswagen. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Queensboro Volkswagen filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13499151 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Leonora Teper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" RISC, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B" We Owe Slip, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Kasell, David)
October 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teper v. Queensboro Volkswagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonora Teper
Represented By: David Michael Kasell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queensboro Volkswagen
Represented By: Paul Aloe
Represented By: David Nicholas Saponara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?