Kokolski v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Vittoria Kokolski
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. and Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv04904
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Letter by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. (Hensley, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.. (Hensley, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Court dispenses with its pre-motion conference requirement. Therefore, the Court denies Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference, ECF No. #6 , as moot and GRANTS leave to file the anticipated motion to dismiss.The Court orders the following briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss: Defendants shall submit their motion no later than Friday, December 4, 2020 by 5:00 P.M.; Plaintiff shall submit a response no later than Friday, January 15, 2021 by 5:00 P.M.; Defendants shall submit a reply, if any, no later than Friday, February 12, 2021 by 5:00 P.M.As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 P.M. on February 12, 2021. Defendants shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Ms. Alexis Love So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 10/19/2020. (Helwig, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Incorporated (Hensley, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 13, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a correct Civil Cover Sheet. The NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page was check that This is a Notice of Removal from Nassau or Suffolk County,however it is being Removed from Supreme Court of Queens County. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Incorporated (Hensley, Michael)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from New York Supreme, Queens County, case number 714001/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13507943) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hensley, Michael) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/14/2020) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/14/2020) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/14/2020) (Lee, Tiffeny).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kokolski v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Thomas Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Thomas Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vittoria Kokolski
Represented By: John Nicholas Miras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?