Scollan v. The City of New York
Plaintiff: Police Officer Patrick Scollan
Defendant: The City of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv04977
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Andrew Buchsbaum, John James; Michael Finkelstein. Proposed scheduling order adopted. Fact discovery deadline 4/1/21. Settlement explored, but after completion of depositions and IME. Next conference 4/28/21 at 10:30.Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/9/2020 (Levy, Robert)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Patrick Scollan (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for December 9, 2020 at 3:00 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to confirm with defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by All Defendants. (Finkelstein, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Finkelstein on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Finkelstein, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Scollan. The City of New York served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Receipt) (James, John)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew V. Buchsbaum on behalf of Patrick Scollan (aty to be noticed) (Buchsbaum, Andrew)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against The City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Patrick Scollan. (James, John)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Patrick Scollan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (James, John)
October 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scollan v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Michael Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Officer Patrick Scollan
Represented By: John P. James
Represented By: Andrew V. Buchsbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?