Etts v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theresa Etts
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04991
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/14/2020 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Bohrer for plaintiff, Surcouf for defendants. The case management schedule proposed by the parties, calling among other things for completion of fact discovery by April 19, 2021, disclosure of plaintiff's expert reports by August 20, 2021, disclosure of defendant's expert reports by May 1, 2021, and completion of expert discovery by May 17, 2021, is approved. The parties are encouraged to accelerate the exchange of expert reports on damages, which are not likely to require completion of fact discovery before preparation, in aid of settlement. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FURTHER CONFERENCE AT 10:00 AM ON MAY 13, 2021. The parties shall be prepared (1) to state their respective positions on whether a settlement might be productive, (2) to articulate the basis for any anticipated summary judgment motions and to be familiar with any pre-motion conference procedures required by the district judge presiding over the case, and (3) to state whether the parties will consent to reassignment of this action to a magistrate judge for all purposes. Counsel are encouraged to file a written application requesting a settlement conference or referral to court-annexed mediation on an earlier date if they believe it might be productive to do so. (Gillespie, Saudia)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Kaufman, Jonathan)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held on December 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel shall confer with each other, complete the attached initial conference questionnaire and electronically file two days prior to the conference. Each party is directed to call the following conference number: 877-336-1839 and use access code 3482793. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Surcouf, Allison)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group for Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Surcouf, Allison)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Theresa Etts (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13537570 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Theresa Etts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bohrer, Abram)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etts v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Etts
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Represented By: David Arthur Zeitzoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Allison M Surcouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?