Shorok v. Abouelela et al
Plaintiff: Maria A. Shorok
Defendant: Joanna Abouelela, Wael Nour and Nervin Bekhit
Case Number: 1:2020cv05076
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-00429. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/22/2020. (jdb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 Letter requesting case be transferred to District Court in NY filed by Shorok V. Abouelela. (abr ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Telephone status call is hereby scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 1:00 p.m. All parties should call the chamber's conference line. (888-398-2342 access code 3570932#) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/14/2020. (kas)[Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 10/14/2020. (kas) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The rule 16 conference via telephone that was scheduled for 9/17/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 10/14/2020 at 1:00 p.m. All parties should call the chamber's conference line. (888-398-2342 access code 3570932#). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/6/2020. (kas) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from MARIA A. SHOROK regarding rule 16 conference on 9/17/2020. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
September 10, 2020 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The rule 16 conference scheduled for 9/17/2020 at 3:00 pm will be conducted via telephone. All parties should call the chamber's conference line. (888-398-2342 access code 3570932#).(kas) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 3:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/20/2020. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss; all claims against Joanna Abouelela and Wael Nour are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2020. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by MARIA A. SHOROK re #4 MOTION to Dismiss. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by NERVIN BEKHIT.(jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 4/6/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by JOANNA ABOUELELA, WAEL NOUR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Gary M. Didieo, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Declaration of Gary M. Didieo - ECF)(jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARIA A. SHOROK as to NERVIN BEKHIT, WAEL NOUR, and JOANNA ABOUELELA. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOANNA ABOUELELA, NERVIN BEKHIT, WAEL NOUR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOANNA ABOUELELA, NERVIN BEKHIT, WAEL NOUR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW041648), filed by MARIA A. SHOROK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shorok v. Abouelela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Abouelela
Represented By: Gary M. Didieo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wael Nour
Represented By: Gary M. Didieo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nervin Bekhit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria A. Shorok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?