Lafata et al v. Kim
Plaintiff: Clove Lakes E.N.T., P.C., Amanda Lafata and Christopher Lafata
Defendant: Dr. Helen H. Kim
Case Number: 1:2020cv05078
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, as to Clove Lakes E.N.T, P.C., by Clove Lakes E.N.T., P.C.. (Garson, Andrew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, as to Helen H. Kim, M.D. by Helen H. Kim. (Garson, Andrew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shari Beth Fein on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Fein, Shari)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shari Beth Fein on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Fein, Shari)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Lafata, Amanda Lafata. Clove Lakes E.N.T., P.C. served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Oh, Jaehyun)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Lafata, Amanda Lafata. Helen H. Kim served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Oh, Jaehyun)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on January 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By January 15, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to ensure that defendants are aware of this conference. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/23/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clove Lakes E.N.T., P.C., Helen H. Kim. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clove Lakes E.N.T., P.C., Helen H. Kim filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13567073 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Christopher Lafata, Amanda Lafata. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons HELEN H. KIM, M.D., #3 Proposed Summons CLOVE LAKES E.N.T., P.C.) (Oh, Jaehyun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafata et al v. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clove Lakes E.N.T., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lafata
Represented By: Jaehyun Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lafata
Represented By: Jaehyun Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Helen H. Kim
Represented By: Andrew S. Garson
Represented By: Shari Beth Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?