Grant v. Rego Park N.A. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Grant
Defendant: Felicia Whitfield, Rego Park N.A. Ltd. d/b/a Rego Park Health Care, Falecia Whitfield and Rego Park Health Care
Not Classified By Court: Barry J Peek
Case Number: 1:2020cv05226
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn)
December 9, 2020 SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Barry J Peek selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on January 4, 2021. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 1/18/2021. (Weinstein, Robyn)
November 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 11/24/2020 (AT&T Log #11:38-12:08.) (Rein, Gilbert)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court held an initial conference in this case on November 24, 2020. As discussed on the record, the Court hereby refers the instant action to Court annexed mediation. The parties are directed to contact Robyn Weinstein, the Court's ADR Administrator, at (718) 613-2578. The Court defers setting discovery deadlines pending the parties' good faith efforts to resolve this case through mediation except that the parties shall informally exchange discovery in preparation for mediation. The mediation must be completed by January 15, 2021. The parties shall file a status letter by January 22, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/24/2020. (Rein, Gilbert)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Case Management Plan (Rule 26(f) Meeting Report) (Courtian, Jennifer)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Brooke Slutsky on behalf of Michael Grant (aty to be noticed) (Slutsky, Amanda)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael Grant (Ehrlich, David)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants' counsel removed this FMLA case from the Queens County Supreme Court on October 29, 2020. ECF No. 1. Any party seeking a trial by jury shall file a jury demand by November 13, 2020. Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3)(A). The Court shall hold an initial conference by telephone on November 24, 2020 at 11:30am. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 11:30 a.m. A planning conference pursuant to Rule 26(a) shall be held by November 17, 2020. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to amend the docket to reflect the correct spelling of defendants' names as "Falecia Whitfield" and "Rego Park Health Care." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/6/2020. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Rego Park N.A. Ltd., Felicia Whitfield. (Courtian, Jennifer)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rego Park N.A. Ltd. (Courtian, Jennifer)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan C. Chapoteau on behalf of Rego Park N.A. Ltd., Felicia Whitfield (aty to be noticed) (Chapoteau, Ryan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Rego Park N.A. Ltd., Felicia Whitfield (Courtian, Jennifer)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rego Park N.A. Ltd., Felicia Whitfield from Supreme Court of the State of New York, case number 717534/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BNYEDC-13606572) (Attachments: #1 A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Courtian, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Rego Park N.A. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Whitfield
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Courtian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rego Park N.A. Ltd. d/b/a Rego Park Health Care
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Courtian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falecia Whitfield
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Courtian
Represented By: Ryan C. Chapoteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rego Park Health Care
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Courtian
Represented By: Ryan C. Chapoteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grant
Represented By: David R. Ehrlich
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Slutsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Barry J Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?