Riddick v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dwight Riddick and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv05396
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Zeigler on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Commissioner will obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and will file the record by February 4, 2021. By March 8, 2021, counsel for the plaintiff must send a written settlement proposal to counsel for the Commissioner, summarizing the plaintiffs strongest arguments, with specific references to the portions of the record supporting those arguments, to determine if the case can be resolved. By April 7, 2021, the parties must file a stipulation dismissing, remanding or otherwise resolving the case, or a joint letter stating that they intend to proceed to briefing on their respective positions. If the parties are not able to resolve the case, the plaintiff will file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by May 7, 2021; the Commissioner file and serve its response to the plaintiff's motion by July 6, 2021; the plaintiff will file and serve a reply, if any, by July 27, 2021. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and 4(C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memoranda page limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda include citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/9/2020. (Greene, Donna)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13645888 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Dwight Riddick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romano, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddick v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Riddick
Represented By: Joseph Albert Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?