Arnold v. New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Geralda Xavier and Desiree Arnold
Defendant: Sheldon MacLeod, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Nicole Constantine and Steven Pulitzer
Case Number: 1:2020cv05666
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 1/13/2021 conference, all discovery must be completed by 5/28/2021. On or before 5/28/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 6/30/2021, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 7/30/2021, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/6/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 4/29/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/13/2021. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 1/13/2021. Randy Edward Kleinman and Alon Ginsburg appearing for Plaintiff. Mr. Ginsburg is to file a notice of appearance. Dominique F. Saint-Fort appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:33-11:49.) (Quinlan, Krista)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Nicole Constantine, Sheldon MacLeod, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Steven Pulitzer, Geralda Xavier. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant failed to comply with the Court's 11/25/2020 Order. On or before 1/11/2021, Defendant must comply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/8/2021. (Quinlan, Krista)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order by Nicole Constantine, Sheldon MacLeod, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, Steven Pulitzer, Geralda Xavier (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephone Conference originally scheduled for 1/14/2021 will be held on 1/13/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/5/2021. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/30/2020. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 1/14/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 1/7/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/25/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation. (Saint-Fort, Dominique) Modified on 11/25/2020 to correct motion type. (Quinlan, Krista).
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation from New York Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 520965/20. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13727898) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declarations) (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
November 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE: Please file the Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon MacLeod
Represented By: Dominique F. Saint-Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation
Represented By: Dominique F. Saint-Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Constantine
Represented By: Dominique F. Saint-Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Pulitzer
Represented By: Dominique F. Saint-Fort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geralda Xavier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Arnold
Represented By: Randy Edward Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?