Rahaman v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Maksudur Rahaman
Respondent: Jane Does 1-10, Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, ABC Agency 1-10, Acting Director Kevin McAleenan, John Does 1-10, William P. Barr, Bureau of Consular Affairs and Director Texas Service Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv05897
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Texas Service Center. (Herrera, Isaiah)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Maksudur Rahaman (Gharti-Chhetry, Khagendra)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER -- On December 7, 2020, Petitioner was informed that Petitioner's proposed summonses were not issued because of certain defects. By Order dated January 4, 2021, Petitioner was given until January 11, 2021 to correct those defects. Petitioner was cautioned that failure to comply may result in dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. Petitioner has failed to comply. Petitioner's deadline to comply is extended a final time, to February 1, 2021. If Petitioner fails by that date to submit new, corrected proposed summonses or to notify the Court that Petitioner no longer intends to pursue this action, the Court is likely to dismiss this action for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 1/19/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER -- A review of the docket entries in this action indicates that Petitioner's proposed summonses were not issued due to certain defects that remain unaddressed. No later than January 11, 2021, Petitioner must either submit new, corrected proposed summonses or notify the Court that Petitioner no longer intends to pursue this action. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 1/4/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany L. Primavera on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Primavera, Brittany)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 7, 2020 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 4, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition of Writ of Mandamus against ABC Agency 1-10, William P. Barr, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, Texas Service Center filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13785953 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Maksudur Rahaman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gharti-Chhetry, Khagendra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahaman v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ABC Agency 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Consular Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Texas Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maksudur Rahaman
Represented By: Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?