Jermanok v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James P Jermanok
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a the Bank of New York, As Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA As trustee for the Structured Asset Securities Corporation Pass Through Certificates Series 1998, Bank of New York Mellon, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper and The Bank of New York
Case Number: 1:2020cv05936
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. This court grants defendants a 30 day extension to move against Plaintiff's complaint. The defendants will file their response by Friday, March 5, 2021. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/27/2021. (Urquiola, Rebecca)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, seeking extension through March 5, 2021 by Bank of New York Mellon, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Scibetta, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Scibetta, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon. (Scibetta, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Peter Scibetta on behalf of Bank of New York Mellon, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Scibetta, Brian)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bank of New York Mellon, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by James P Jermanok (Howe, Julie)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by James P Jermanok (Howe, Julie)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 8, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jermanok against Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a the Bank of New York, As Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA As trustee for the Structured Asset Securities Corporation Pass Through Certificates Series 1998, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13795052 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by James P Jermanok. (Howe, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jermanok v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Jermanok
Represented By: Julie Anne Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a the Bank of New York, As Successor in Interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA As trustee for the Structured Asset Securities Corporation Pass Through Certificates Series 1998
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Brian Peter Scibetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Brian Peter Scibetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Brian Peter Scibetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?