Khattri v. Cuccinelli et al
Petitioner: PAWAN KHATTRI
Respondent: Jane Does 1-10, Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, ABC Agency 1-10, William P Barr, John Does 1-10, US Department of State, Texas Service Center, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2020cv05953
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 2/3/2021. (Almonte, Giselle)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE that this action shall be dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. ( Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/1/2021 ) *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann) Roseann).
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal respectfully submitted for the Court's endorsement by ABC Agency 1-10, William P Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin K. McAleenan, Texas Service Center, US Department of State, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs (Weinberg, Alex)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Scott Weinberg on behalf of ABC Agency 1-10, William P Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin K. McAleenan, Texas Service Center, US Department of State, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Alex)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Texas Service Center, US Department of State, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Writ of Mandamus against ABC Agency 1-10, William P Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin K. McAleenan, Texas Service Center, US Department of State, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13833911 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by PAWAN KHATTRI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gharti-Chhetry, Khagendra)
December 14, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khattri v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Does 1-10
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ABC Agency 1-10
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of State
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Texas Service Center
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Consular Affairs
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAWAN KHATTRI
Represented By: Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?