Cao v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Huiqing Cao
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Kevin K. McAleenan, Director of Texas Se Tony Bryson, Director of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli and US Atty General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv06192
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Mary Speight on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Speight, Melanie)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huiqing Cao. All Defendants. (Hu, Lewis)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Tony Bryson, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Huiqing Cao (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hu, Lewis)
December 29, 2020 ***FINAL NOTICE:*** Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 22, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Huiqing Cao (Hu, Lewis)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13877270, filed by Huiqing Cao. (Hu, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cao v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Melanie Mary Speight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Texas Se Tony Bryson
Represented By: Melanie Mary Speight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Melanie Mary Speight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Atty General William Barr
Represented By: Melanie Mary Speight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huiqing Cao
Represented By: Lewis Guangwei Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?