Vargas v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sonia Vargas and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv06245
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Canning on behalf of Andrew Saul (aty to be noticed) (Canning, Dennis)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #2 Summons Issued as to USA. Counsel is advised that on March 2, 2020, the Commissioner of Social Security filed a notice in the Federal Register setting forth the names and current addresses for service of process on the Commissioner in disability cases for each United States District Court. See https://www.federalregister.gov/documents/2020/03/02/2020-04246/notice-announcing-addresses-for-service-of-process. The Notice announced that service of process for the Eastern District of New York was directed to be made upon the Regional Chief Counsel's Office in Kansas City, Missouri. The Department of Justice and U.S. Attorneys Office shall be served in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/28/2020. (Tran, Alexander)
December 23, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13886183 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Sonia Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romano, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Vargas
Represented By: Joseph Albert Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?