Macareno v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yenifer Macareno
Defendant: Christian G. Calix and Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06323
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 1:20-cv-06323 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Attorneys for Defendants DELTA AIR LINES, INC. and CRISTIAN G. CALIX by Yenifer Macareno. (Attachments: #1 The Motor Vehicle Crash Report, #2 Photographs depicting the damages to the vehicle operated by plaintiff, #3 HIPAA compliant authorizations, #4 Plaintiff Medical Records, #5 Plaintiff Medical Records Part 2) (Abruzzino, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held on March 4, 2021 @ 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED: ORDER, INITIAL CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE, AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE.Counsel are directed to confer to jointly fill out and docket the attached questionnaire by 3:00 p.m. on March 2, 2021. *** To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833.If the parties are initially unable to connect to the call, please try again as the third-party conference call system has been overloaded at times. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/9/2021. (LK)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Christian G. Calix, Delta Air Lines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Service (Secretary of State), #2 Exhibit B- Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Plaintiff's Letter to Delta of May 15, 2019, #4 Exhibit D- The Port Authoritys Tender Letter to Delta attaching Plaintiffs Verified Notice of Claim) (Martinez, Louis)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. I adopt Judge Mann's thoughtful and well-reasoned Report and Recommendation. By February 12, 2021, the defendants are directed to file an Amended Notice of Removal, or I will remand this action to state court. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/5/2021. (Greene, Donna)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint Received by Delta, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Attorneys' Letter to Delta of May 15, 2019, #3 Exhibit C- The Port Authority's Tender Letter to Delta attaching Plaintiffs Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit D- Plaintiff's Affidavit of Service on Calix) (Maragoudakis, Michael)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUA SPONTE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Christian G. Calix, Delta Air Lines, Inc. For the reasons set forth in the attached, the Court respectfully recommends that this action be remanded sua sponte to Supreme Court, Kings County, for lack of jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/6/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Christian G. Calix, Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Martinez, Louis)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Christian G. Calix. (Martinez, Louis)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Martinez, Louis)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Maragoudakis on behalf of Christian G. Calix, Delta Air Lines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Maragoudakis, Michael)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Martinez, Louis)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Christian G. Calix, Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Martinez, Louis)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Kings County New York Supreme Court, case number 521595/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13907077) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint) (Martinez, Louis)
December 29, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 29, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macareno v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian G. Calix
Represented By: Louis Robert Martinez
Represented By: Michael G. Maragoudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Robert Martinez
Represented By: Michael G. Maragoudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yenifer Macareno
Represented By: Robert G. Abruzzino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?