Despiau v. Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc.
Plaintiff: Guillermina Despiau
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv06368
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Guillermina Despiau. Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc. waiver sent on 12/30/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Mesidor, Marjorie)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna)
January 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Mathew Friedman on behalf of Guillermina Despiau (aty to be noticed) (Friedman, Joshua)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13914298 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Guillermina Despiau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Mesidor, Marjorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Despiau v. Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Greater New York and Northern New Jersey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermina Despiau
Represented By: Joshua Mathew Friedman
Represented By: Marjorie Mesidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?