Ros v. Air Canada
Plaintiff: Nancy Ros
Defendant: Air Canada
Case Number: 1:2021cv00357
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on February 25, 2021: The Court conducts a telephonic initial conference. The parties must exchange initial disclosures by March 4, 2021, including plaintiff's damages calculations. The deadline to amend the complaint as of right and join additional parties is April 2, 2021. By May 25, 2021, the parties must file a joint letter-motion requesting a settlement conference or a referral to court-annexed mediation. Fact discovery must be completed by September 3, 2021. Plaintiff's medical expert disclosures must be served by July 9, 2021 and defendant's medical expert disclosures must be served by August 9, 2021. The Court defers setting all other deadlines. See attached. (GM)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Completed Initial Conference Questionnaire (Weissman, Philip)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nancy Ros (Gallo, Stephanie)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Gallo on behalf of Nancy Ros (aty to be noticed) (Gallo, Stephanie)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held in this case at 12:00 p.m. on February 25, 2021, before United States Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. To dial in to the initial conference, the parties are directed to call (877) 336-1839 and type in the access code 6672833. ***The completed questionnaire must be filed with the Court by February 23, 2021. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/22/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Air Canada (Weissman, Philip)
January 22, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Air Canada (Weissman, Philip)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air Canada from New York Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 701789/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CNYEDC-14027667) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Answer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Bill of Particulars) (Weissman, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ros v. Air Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canada
Represented By: Philip Richard Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ros
Represented By: Stephanie M Gallo
Represented By: Dean N Liakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?