Xiamen ITG Group Corp. Ltd. v. Peace Bird Trading Corp.
Plaintiff: Xiamen ITG Group Corp. Ltd.
Defendant: Peace Bird Trading Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00535
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant leave to file the anticipated motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The Court hereby ORDERS the following briefing schedule for Defendant's motion: Defendant shall submit their motion no later than Friday, April 30, 2021 at 5:00 P.M.; Plaintiff shall submit their response no later than Friday, June 11, 2021 at 5:00 P.M.; and Defendant shall submit their reply, if any, no later than Friday, July 2, 2021 at 5:00 P.M. As a courtesy to the Court, the Court requests the parties refrain from filing motion papers until the motion has been fully briefed. If the parties elect to file their motion only once it is fully briefed, the notice of motion and all supporting papers are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the movant represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter shall be electronically filed in advance of the fully briefed motion, and it must be filed as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, each party shall electronically file their individual motion papers by 5:00 P.M. Defendant shall also mail a complete set of courtesy copies of all motion papers, via overnight mail, to the Court, attention of Ms. Alexis Love. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/30/2021. (Love, Alexis)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document by Peace Bird Trading Corp.. (Horn, Michael)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Peace Bird Trading Corp. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/31/2021. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/21/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 4/15/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/1/2021. (Quinlan, Krista)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Peace Bird Trading Corp.. (Horn, Michael)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peace Bird Trading Corp. (Horn, Michael)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Horn on behalf of Peace Bird Trading Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Horn, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Peace Bird Trading Corp.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 2, 2021 The case of Xiamen ITG Group Corp. Ltd. v. Peace Bird Trading Corp., has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 21cv535. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 2, 2021 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14085129 (Xiang, Ruofei)
February 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION re: Arbitration Award , filed by Xiamen ITG Group Corp. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C) (Xiang, Ruofei) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/2/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiamen ITG Group Corp. Ltd. v. Peace Bird Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peace Bird Trading Corp.
Represented By: Michael S. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiamen ITG Group Corp. Ltd.
Represented By: Ruofei Xiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?