Lin v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Chengwu Lin
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson, Alejando Mayorkas and Gregory Richardson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00858
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the letter submitted by defense counsel on March 23, 2021. See ECF No. #6 . The Court hereby GRANTS defense counsel's request, with Plaintiff's counsel's consent, to extend Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this case to June 18, 2021. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/23/2021. (Love, Alexis)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move or otherwise respond to the Complaint until June 18, 2021 by Alejando Mayorkas, Gregory Richardson, Monty Wilkinson. (Price, Thomas)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Russell Price on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Price, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alejando Mayorkas, Gregory Richardson, Monty Wilkinson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alejando Mayorkas, Gregory Richardson, Monty Wilkinson filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14160405 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Chengwu Lin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Chien, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Represented By: Thomas Russell Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejando Mayorkas
Represented By: Thomas Russell Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Richardson
Represented By: Thomas Russell Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chengwu Lin
Represented By: David Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?