Blase v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blase
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00990
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E. Perez o/b/o Kenneth Blase of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Appeals Council Denial, sent via regular mail on 3/25/2021 to Judge Chen's chambers. (Layne, Monique)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Defendant must file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by 5/26/2021. Plaintiff must file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by 7/26/2021. Defendant must file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by 9/24/2021. Plaintiff must file and serve a reply, if any, by 10/15/2021. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/25/2021. (Li, Caroline) (Abdallah, Fida).
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14192060 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kenneth Blase. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romano, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blase v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blase
Represented By: Joseph Albert Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?