Wolkomir v. Tyson et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Wolkomir
Defendant: Dean Banks, Robert Thurber, Jeffrey K. Schomburger, Mikel A. Durham, Barbara Tyson, Kevin M. McNamara, Mike Beebe, Guardie E. Banister, Les R. Baledge, David J. Bronczek, Stewart Glendinning, John H. Tyson, Cheryl S. Miller, Noel White, Jonathan D. Mariner and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01043
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
2 Judge: William F Kuntz
3 Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyson Foods, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00730-AMD-RLM, 1:21-cv-01043-AMD-RLM (Eaton, Mary)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge William F. Kuntz, II, Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/10/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to Clerk of Court Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 50.3.1 by Les R. Baledge, Guardie E. Banister, Dean Banks, Mike Beebe, David J. Bronczek, Mikel A. Durham, Stewart Glendinning, Jonathan D. Mariner, Kevin M. McNamara, Cheryl S. Miller, Jeffrey K. Schomburger, Robert Thurber, Barbara Tyson, John H. Tyson, Tyson Foods, Inc., Noel White (Eaton, Mary)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Angelo Caselli on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Caselli, Nicholas)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Eve Kotler on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Kotler, Meredith)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Jane Eaton on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Eaton, Mary)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING AND TEMPORARILY STAYING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND ESTABLISHING A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE: The parties, through their undersigned counsel, hereby agree, stipulate, and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order as follows: The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and any trial, under Case No. 1:21-cv-00730 (the "Consolidated Action"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). Application #5 is Granted. (See Order for details) SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/8/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00730-DG-SJB, 1:21-cv-01043-WFK-CLP (Tavarez, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION (JOINT) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING AND TEMPORARILY STAYING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND ESTABLISHING A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE by Michelle Wolkomir (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Egleston, Gregory)
March 8, 2021 Case Consolidated., Cases associated. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Michelle Wolkomir (Egleston, Gregory)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Les R. Baledge, Guardie E. Banister, Dean Banks, Mike Beebe, David J. Bronczek, Mikel A. Durham, Stewart Glendinning, Jonathan D. Mariner, Kevin M. McNamara, Cheryl S. Miller, Jeffrey K. Schomburger, Robert Thurber, Barbara Tyson, John H. Tyson, Tyson Foods, Inc., Noel White filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14210594 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Michelle Wolkomir. (Egleston, Gregory)
February 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolkomir v. Tyson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Wolkomir
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Banks
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thurber
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K. Schomburger
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikel A. Durham
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Tyson
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. McNamara
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardie E. Banister
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les R. Baledge
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Bronczek
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Glendinning
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Tyson
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl S. Miller
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel White
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Mariner
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Nicholas Angelo Caselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?