Intuit Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC and Intuit Inc.
Defendant: Visa International Service Association, Mastercard Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa U.S.A Inc. and Mastercard International Incorporated
Special Master: James Orenstein
Case Number: 1:2021cv01175
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPOINTING Special Master re 8831 Letter from Rule 23(b)(3) Class Counsel re Proposed Order Appointing Special Master; 8833 Certain Absent Class Members' Letter Seeking Modification of Proposed Order; 8836 Old Jericho's Letter Objecting to Proposed Order; 8837 Fikes Wholesale's Letter Regarding Special Master Procedures; 8838 Jack Rabbit's Letter in Response to Minute Orders. The Court finds that appointment of a Special Master is warranted and appoints the Honorable James Orenstein (Ret.) as Special Master to resolve any disputes or matters arising out of or relating to the Plan of Administration, including the proper scope of a requested exclusion from the Rule23(b)(3) Settlement Class and the resolution of claims made to the Net Cash Settlement Fund as well as any other matters the Court refers to the Special Master. As set forth in the attached order, the Court adopts the modification to Class Counsel's Proposed Order regarding confidentiality requested by Certain Class Members but otherwise adopts the procedures set forth in Class Counsels Proposed Order, except as to the manner of review by the Court of the Special Master's reports and recommendations. The Court denies Certain Class Members request that the Court shorten the time frames for filings; Old Jericho and Jack Rabbit's objection that the disputes regarding franchisees and franchisors should be resolved in the first instance by the special master; and Jack Rabbit's objections that the order should clarify that the parties are required to put any approval of ex parte contact in writing and that any financial information must be filed under seal. The Court reserves decision as to whether to certify a subclass and appoint subclass counsel. So Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/2/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TLH)
July 21, 2023 Filing 49 Letter in Response to ECF 8869 and ECF 8867 by Jack Rabbit LLC Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Rothstein, Paul)
July 10, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Eisenstein on behalf of Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Eisenstein, Matthew)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 8844 Proposed Briefing Schedule. The Court grants the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Plaintiffs shall serve their supplemental oppositions on or before June 26, 2023; Defendants shall serve their replies on or before August 4, 2023; Plaintiffs shall serve and file sur-replies on or before August 18, 2023. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/12/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER re 8831 Letter from Rule 23(b)(3) Class Counsel in response to the Court's minute entry. The Court directs parties and objectors to submit any objection to the proposed special masters or special master procedures on or before May 26, 2023. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/19/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB)
May 13, 2023 Filing 47 Minute entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On May 11, 2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6F North, the Court heard from the parties and objectors. Damages action:The parties will first try to resolve service awards issue in view of the Second Circuit decision, but if they are unable to do so, Class Counsel will advise the Court and file a motion and the Court will give objectors an opportunity to respond. On or before May 18, 2023, the parties shall submit the names of at least two additional potential candidates for special master as well as a proposed order regarding the role of the special master; the Court will give other parties the opportunity to respond to the proposal. The Court will consider requests from counsel to be appointed to represent the franchisees as a class; and Class Counsel will have the opportunity to explain why current counsel can fairly present the issues to the special master and why the Court should delay any appointment of counsel to represent the franchisees. Jack Rabbit will serve a second renewed motion to intervene on or before May 18, 2023; Class Counsel and Old Jericho Plaintiffs (and any other party) will serve a response on or before June 1, 2023; Jack Rabbit will serve and file any reply on or before June 8, 2023. Equitable Relief Action, opt-out actions and actions filed after the (b)(3) settlement:On or before June 11, 2023, the parties will advise the Court as to whether they would like to supplement their response to Defendants' summary judgment motion to address the issue of direct evidence of an anticompetitive effect in the two-sided transaction market. See 1-800 Contacts, Inc., 1 F.4th 102 (2d Cir. 2021); see also Brooke Group Ltd. v. Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corp., 509 U.S. 209, 242 (1993) ("Expert testimony is useful as a guide to interpreting market facts, but it is not a substitute for them."); Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd. V. British Airways PLC, 257 F.3d 256, 264 (2d Cir. 2001) (explaining that expert testimony rooted in hypothetical assumptions cannot substitute for "actual market data"). On or before June 12, 2023, counsel will submit a joint letter with their proposed schedule for supplemental discovery to conclude no later than November 9, 2023. If counsel believe that they need longer than the previously requested 150 days to complete discovery, they should explain their reasons for the additional time requested. To the extent counsel do not agree on the proposed schedule for supplemental discovery, they should explain with specificity the reasons their disagreement(s). Grubhub Plaintiffs will join Target's summary judgment motion and supplemental letters and Defendants will file any summary judgment motions within sixty days of Grubhubs filings; the parties will agree a briefing schedule. On or before June 11, 2023, the parties in Lanning and Camp Coffee Grounds will propose a schedule for discovery. (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 8821 request to listen to status conference remotely. All parties are informed that the court's public line and access code will be published on the Court's calendar. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/5/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting (207) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-03800-MKB-VMS; granting (213) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-03924-MKB-VMS; granting (208) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-03925-MKB-VMS; granting (202) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04131-MKB-VMS; granting (230) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04194-MKB-VMS; granting (272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04521-MKB-VMS; granting (273) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04520-MKB-VMS; granting (253) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04650-MKB-VMS; granting (189) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04677-MKB-VMS; granting (244) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04728-MKB-VMS; granting (254) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04799-MKB-VMS; granting (8802) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS; granting (196) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-04974-MKB-VMS; granting (218) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05077-MKB-VMS; granting (237) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05075-MKB-VMS; granting (243) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-VMS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05071-MKB-VMS; granting (220) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05069-MKB-VMS; granting (219) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05081-MKB-VMS; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05083-MKB-VMS; granting (219) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05082-MKB-VMS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05080-MKB-VMS; granting (214) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05078-MKB-VMS; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05076-MKB-VMS; granting (219) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-VMS; granting (221) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05070-MKB-VMS; granting (217) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05072-MKB-VMS; granting (198) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05153-MKB-VMS; granting (265) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05207-MKB-VMS; granting (259) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-VMS; granting (202) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05352-MKB-VMS; granting (216) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05866-MKB-VMS; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05885-MKB-VMS; granting (155) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05883-MKB-VMS; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05881-MKB-VMS; granting (144) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05869-MKB-VMS; granting (150) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05871-MKB-VMS; granting (149) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-VMS; granting (150) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05880-MKB-VMS; granting (152) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05870-MKB-VMS; granting (156) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05868-MKB-VMS; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05884-MKB-VMS; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05882-MKB-VMS; granting (147) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:05-cv-05878-MKB-VMS; granting (153) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-00039-MKB-VMS; granting (107) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-00078-MKB-VMS; granting (107) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-01829-MKB-VMS; granting (107) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-01830-MKB-VMS; granting (107) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-01831-MKB-VMS; granting (107) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-01832-MKB-VMS; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-VMS; granting (114) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-02534-MKB-VMS; granting (96) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-05583-MKB-VMS; granting (108) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:06-cv-05765-MKB-VMS; granting (106) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:07-cv-00592-MKB-VMS; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-02264-MKB-VMS; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-03225-MKB-VMS; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:13-cv-05352-MKB-VMS; granting (184) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:13-cv-05745-MKB-VMS; granting (263) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:13-cv-05746-MKB-VMS; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:14-cv-00261-MKB-VMS; granting (90) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:14-cv-06450-MKB-VMS; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:14-cv-07018-MKB-JO; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:16-cv-05507-MKB-VMS; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-03531-MKB-JO; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-04362-MKB-VMS; granting (143) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-04555-MKB-JO; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:17-cv-05988-MKB-JO; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:18-cv-04568-MKB-JO; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-04256-MKB-JO; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-04616-MKB-VMS; granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-05567-MKB-JO; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 2:19-cv-05882-MKB-VMS; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-06318-MKB-VMS; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:19-cv-06555-MKB-VMS; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-01325-MKB-JO; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-01483-MKB-JO; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 2:20-cv-01517-MKB-VMS; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-02166-MKB-JO; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 2:20-cv-02394-MKB-VMS; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-02495-MKB-JO; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:20-cv-03791-MKB-JO; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-01175-MKB-VMS; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-01519-MKB-VMS; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-02360-MKB-VMS; granting (36) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-03401-MKB-VMS; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:21-cv-06708-MKB-VMS; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:22-cv-04489-MKB-VMS; granting (7) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:23-cv-00232-MKB-VMS; granting (34) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:23-cv-01215-MKB-VMS. Attorney Arun Srinivas Subramanian terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/11/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (GS)
March 24, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Arun Subramanian by Gielen Enterprises,Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart Inc., Rice Palace,Inc.;, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Tobacco Plus,Inc.;. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Subramanian, Arun)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In view of the Second Circuit's decision affirming the class settlement of the damages class action, Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon will hold a joint status conference on May 11, 2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6F. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report on or before April 21, 2023, regarding proposed next steps. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/23/2023. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB)
January 4, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and E-Mail Addresses Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Warshaw, Daniel)
November 3, 2022 Filing 44 Letter Pursuant to Chief Judge Brodies Individual Practices and Rules, subpart 3, governing motions. by Jack Rabbit LLC Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Bacharach, N.)
November 3, 2022 Filing 43 Letter Pursuant to Chief Judge Brodies Individual Practices and Rules, subpart 3, governing motions. by Jack Rabbit LLC Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Bacharach, N.)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8720) re 8138. Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8138 Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Opinions on EMV Chargebacks and for Partial Summary Judgment.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8719) re 8090, 8108, 8114, 8135, and 8207 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8090 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report and Opinions of Defense Expert R. Garrison Harvey, grants in part and denies in part 8108 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Glenn Hubbard, denies 8114 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Barbara E. Kahn, denies 8135 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert David J. Teece, and grants in part and denies in part 8207 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report and Opinions of Defense Expert David P. Kaplan.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8718) re 8077, 8086, 8080, and 8075 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants in part and denies in part 8077 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mansour Karimzadeh, 8086 Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dennis W. Carlton, 8080 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Stephen C. Mott, and 8075 Motion to Exclude Opinions of David P. Stowell.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION (Redaction of Document 8717) re 8181 and 8200 Motions to Exclude and 8179 Motion for Joinder. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8181 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report & Opinions of Defense Expert Kevin M. Murphy, grants in part and denies in part 8200 Motion to Exclude Portions of Reports & Opinions of Defense Experts Marc Cleven & Stuart J. Fiske, and grants 8179 Motion for Joinder.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Redaction of Document 8716) re 8084 and 8070 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 8084 Motion to Exclude in Part Section 2 and Debit Opinions of Professor Jerry Hausman and 8070 Motion to Exclude Testimony Concerning Visa's Fixed Acquirer Network Fee.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (TL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to unseal Memorandum and Order 8715. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/26/2022. (AB)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 8723 Letter re Proposed Intervenors' request to withdraw their Renewed Motion to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24, request to file an amended version of the motion and proposed briefing schedule. The Proposed Intervenors shall serve their amended motion on or before November 3, 2022; parties shall serve any opposition on or before November 18, 2022; Proposed Intervenors shall serve their reply, if any, and file the motion on or before December 2, 2022. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/24/2022. (AB)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re 8709 Letter re Proposed Intervenors, Jack Rabbit, LLC, and 280 Station LLC (D/B/A/ Cowboys), Renewed Motion for Leave to Intervene and Memorandum in Support Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. The Court directs the proposed intervenors and parties to confer and file a proposed briefing schedule for the motion to intervene on or before October 24, 2022. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/14/2022. (AB) Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/14/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (AB)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order The Court has filed Memoranda and Orders 8714 , 8715 , 8716 , 8717 , 8718 , 8719 , and 8720 under seal and directs the parties to identify on or before October 24, 2022, which portions, if any, should be redacted prior to a public filing. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/9/2022. (NC)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 1821 and 1829 Motions to Exclude. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies 1821 Motion to Exclude Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Andres V. Lerner and 1829 Motion to Exclude Portions of Report and Opinions of Defense Expert Kevin M. Murphy.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (BBM)
August 12, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Demian Alexander Ordway on behalf of Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Ordway, Demian)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER in case 1:05-cv-03800-MKB-VMS; granting (8432) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. in case 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS; granting (71) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.; granting (72) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. in case 1:16-cv-05507-MKB-VMS Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/26/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista)
April 20, 2021 Filing 29 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS, 1:21-cv-01175-MKB-VMS (Wolfson, Adam)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re 8424 Letter filed by Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation - Class Plaintiffs' request for approval of 1st quarter 2021 tax payments for the Class I Cash Settlement Fund and Class II Interchange Settlement Fund is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/12/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista)
March 31, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mastercard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated. (Gallo, Kenneth)
March 31, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A Inc.. (Mason, Robert)
March 31, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Mason on behalf of Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mason, Robert)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/31/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/16/2021. (Quinlan, Krista)
March 15, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mastercard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated. (Carney, Gary)
March 9, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bryan Wolfson on behalf of Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Wolfson, Adam)
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01234. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 8, 2021 The case of Intuit Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al, has been transferred from District of California Northern to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 1:21-cv-01175-MKB-VMS. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Marziliano, August)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.. Signed by MDL Panel Clerk on 3/5/2021. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC (PLAINTIFFS INTUIT INC. AND INTUIT PAYMENT SOLUTIONS, LLC'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH STATE STATUTES) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 3/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya (Teruya, Kevin) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC. Mastercard International Incorporated served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC. Mastercard Incorporated served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC. Visa U.S.A. Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC. Visa International Service Association served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC. Visa Inc. served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC.. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Mastercard International Incorporated. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Mastercard Incorporated. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Visa International Service Association. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Visa Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/8/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Intuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mastercard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15599867.). Filed byIntuit Inc., Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intuit Inc. et al v. Visa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Represented By: Robert C. Mason
Represented By: Matthew A. Eisenstein
Represented By: Demian Alexander Ordway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard Incorporated
Represented By: Gary R. Carney, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth A. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Mason
Represented By: Matthew A. Eisenstein
Represented By: Demian Alexander Ordway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Mason
Represented By: Matthew A. Eisenstein
Represented By: Demian Alexander Ordway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Represented By: Gary R. Carney, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth A. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intuit Payment Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intuit Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: James Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?