Harvin v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: William Harvin
Defendant: Police Officer John Does 1-4, Daniel Roman, Kamrul Islam and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv01392
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of New York answer is due 6/11/2021. Application granted, without objection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/19/2021. (LK)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or respond to complaint by City of New York. (Akina, William)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Keaupuni Akina on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Akina, William)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Harvin. City of New York served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Lumer, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kamrul Islam, Daniel Roman. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by William Harvin (Attachments: #1 Summons - Daniel Roman) (Lumer, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by William Harvin (Lumer, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by William Harvin (Lumer, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14283077 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by William Harvin. (Lumer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvin v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamrul Islam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: William Keaupuni Akina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harvin
Represented By: Michael B. Lumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?