The Federal Savings Bank v. Manafort et. al.
Plaintiff: The Federal Savings Bank
Defendant: John Doe 1 through John Doe 10, Kathleen B. Manafort and Paul J. Manafort
Case Number: 1:2021cv01400
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #19 is granted. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6/7/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/6/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
May 5, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Thomas J. McGowan, Esq.'s letter to Judge LeShann DeArcy Hall in response to the letter request filed on this date by the Manafort defendants for a second 30 day extension of time to respond to the commercial foreclosure complaint filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas)
May 5, 2021 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort. (Perry, Rodney)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the pending reassignment of this case to another Magistrate Judge, the telephonic-initial conference scheduled for 4/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara is hereby adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/26/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held at 12:30 P.M. on 4/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the 12:30 P.M. conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 4/30/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/19/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
April 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Crowl on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort (notification declined or already on case) (Crowl, Matthew)
April 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion of Matthew C. Crowl for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/11/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
April 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Perry on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort (notification declined or already on case) (Perry, Rodney)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14356499. by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Crowl, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Crowl, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion of Rodney Perry for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/8/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14350725. by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rodney Perry, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Perry, Rodney)
April 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #12 is granted. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 by 5/7/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/3/2021. (Farrell, Gillian)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Denley on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort (aty to be noticed) (Denley, Brittney)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort. (Cekirge, Nafiz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nafiz Cekirge on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort (aty to be noticed) (Cekirge, Nafiz)
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Federal Savings Bank. Kathleen B. Manafort served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Federal Savings Bank. Paul J. Manafort served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort. (Attachments: #1 Kathleen summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by The Federal Savings Bank (McGowan, Thomas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Federal Savings Bank identifying Corporate Parent National Bancorp Holdings, Inc. for The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas) Modified on 3/17/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Federal Savings Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Kathleen B. Manafort) (McGowan, Thomas) Modified on 3/17/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by The Federal Savings Bank (McGowan, Thomas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe 1 through John Doe 10, Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14284673 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Metes and Bounds Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Note, #5 Exhibit E - Mortgage) (McGowan, Thomas) Modified on 3/17/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
March 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 17, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Specifically, Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Federal Savings Bank v. Manafort et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Thomas J. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen B. Manafort
Represented By: Brittney Denley
Represented By: Matthew C. Crowl
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Manafort
Represented By: Brittney Denley
Represented By: Matthew C. Crowl
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?