Contrarian Funds, L.L.C. v. Visa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Contrarian Funds, L.L.C.
Defendant: Mastercard Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa USA, Inc., VISA International Service Association, Inc. and Mastercard International Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv01519
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER in case 1:05-cv-03800-MKB-VMS; granting (8432) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. in case 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS; granting (71) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.; granting (72) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. in case 1:16-cv-05507-MKB-VMS Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/26/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re 8424 Letter filed by Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation - Class Plaintiffs' request for approval of 1st quarter 2021 tax payments for the Class I Cash Settlement Fund and Class II Interchange Settlement Fund is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/12/2021. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS et al. (Quinlan, Krista)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/2/2021. (Valentin, Winnethka)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order by Contrarian Funds, L.L.C. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS, 1:21-cv-01519-MKB-VMS (Clarick, Gregory)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole L. Gueron on behalf of Contrarian Funds, L.L.C. (aty to be noticed) (Gueron, Nicole)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/23/2021) (Bowens, Priscilla).
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Contrarian Funds, L.L.C. (Clarick, Gregory)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Contrarian Funds, L.L.C. (Clarick, Gregory)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14302706 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Contrarian Funds, L.L.C.. (Clarick, Gregory)
March 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 23, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contrarian Funds, L.L.C. v. Visa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contrarian Funds, L.L.C.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Clarick
Represented By: Nicole L. Gueron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISA International Service Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?