Gesualdi et al v. C.N.C. Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas F. Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal, Michael O' Toole, Frank H. Finkel, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Darin Jeffers and Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Defendant: C.N.C. Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01832
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by C.N.C. Industries, Inc.. (Travis, Christopher)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Travis on behalf of C.N.C. Industries, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Travis, Christopher)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by C.N.C. Industries, Inc.. (Travis, Christopher)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. C.N.C. Industries, Inc. answer is due 6/3/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/7/2021. (LK)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Michael O' Toole, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas F. Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Gesualdi, Robert G. Wessels, Darin Jeffers. C.N.C. Industries, Inc. served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Adler, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Barnes Hahn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Hahn, Marie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to C.N.C. Industries, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas F. Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Adler, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.N.C. Industries, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14342319 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Michael O' Toole, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas F. Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Gesualdi, Robert G. Wessels, Darin Jeffers. (Adler, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gesualdi et al v. C.N.C. Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas F. Corbett
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Bisignano
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Wessels
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bourgal
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O' Toole
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank H. Finkel
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Herbst
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gesualdi
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Jeffers
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Represented By: Marie Barnes Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.N.C. Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?