Weekes v. Jetblue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: ROY WEEKES
Defendant: JANE DOE, WARREN GREEN, FRANK AYALA, JOHN DOE and Jetblue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01965
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall serve their motion on or before June 18, 2021; plaintiff shall serve his opposition on or before August 5, 2021; defendants shall serve their reply, if any, and file their motion on or before August 26, 2021. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/25/2021. (Ajagu, Vanessa)
May 21, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File - proposed briefing schedule for anticipated motion to dismiss by Frank Ayala, Warren Green, Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Berti, Raymond)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court directs the parties to propose a briefing schedule in anticipation of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/12/2021. (Ajagu, Vanessa)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Response to Pre-Motion Conference Request Letter by Roy Weekes (Jackson, Tisha)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #9 Letter Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. The Court orders Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' letter on or before May 7, 2021. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/30/2021. (Ajagu, Vanessa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Frank Ayala, Warren Green, Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Berti, Raymond)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Frank Ayala, Warren Green, Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Berti, Raymond)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on June 15, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By June 10, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defendants' counsel is directed to ensure that Plaintiff is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/14/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Frank Ayala, Warren Green, and Jetblue Airways Corporation to answer or otherwise respond is extended to April 28, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/14/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jetblue Airways Corporation (Berti, Raymond)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Joseph Berti on behalf of Frank Ayala, Warren Green, Jetblue Airways Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Berti, Raymond)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Frank Ayala, Warren Green, Jetblue Airways Corporation (Berti, Raymond) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/13/2021) (Bowens, Priscilla).
April 13, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 13, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jetblue Airways Corporation from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County, case number 523549/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14365604) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Declaration, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berti, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weekes v. Jetblue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN GREEN
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Berti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK AYALA
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Berti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Berti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY WEEKES
Represented By: Tisha M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?