Ferrara et al v. Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frank Finkel, Louis Bisignano, Michael O' Toole, Michael C. Bourgal, Robert Wessels, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Thomas Corbett, Darin Jeffers and Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Defendant: Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc. and John Doe Companies 1-99
Case Number: 1:2021cv02562
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Certificate of Default by Louis Bisignano, Michael C. Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O' Toole, Robert Wessels (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Service) (Adler, Michael)
June 8, 2021 STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 7/8/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Michael O' Toole, Darin Jeffers, Frank Finkel, Michael C. Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Robert Wessels, Thomas Gesualdi. Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc. served on 5/10/2021, answer due 5/31/2021. (Adler, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc., John Doe Companies 1-99 filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14449802 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Michael O' Toole, Darin Jeffers, Frank Finkel, Michael C. Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Robert Wessels, Thomas Gesualdi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Adler, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara et al v. Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Finkel
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Bisignano
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O' Toole
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Bourgal
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wessels
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Herbst
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gesualdi
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Corbett
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Jeffers
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
Represented By: Michael Seth Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Construction Lumber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Companies 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?